ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT et al v. REGAN
Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT and SIERRA CLUB
Defendant: MICHAEL REGAN
Case Number: 1:2021cv03096
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Florence Y Pan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by MICHAEL REGAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Bryan)
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/29/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lee, Sanghyun)
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lee, Sanghyun)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL REGAN served on 11/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lee, Sanghyun)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 11/30/21. (lcaa)
November 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MICHAEL REGAN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
November 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (zsb)
November 23, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, SIERRA CLUB (Lee, Sanghyun)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL REGAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8886386) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT, SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons for Michael Regan, #6 Summons for US Attorney General, #7 Summons for USAO DC)(Lee, Sanghyun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT et al v. REGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Represented By: Sanghyun Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Sanghyun Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL REGAN
Represented By: Bryan J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?