TOPCUOGLU v. INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON et al
Plaintiff: FUNDA TOPCUOGLU
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC and EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03154
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Referring Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to COMPLAINT by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (Bender, Leslie)
January 21, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Hearing by INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Applefeld, David). Added MOTION for Hearing on 1/24/2022 (ztth).
January 20, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Applefeld on behalf of INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON (Applefeld, David)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant Industrial Bank of Washington's #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that David B. Applefeld, Shapiro Sher Guinot & Sandler, P.A., 250 West Pratt Street Suite 2000, Baltimore, Maryland 21201, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 12, 2022. (lcrbw2)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David B. Applefeld, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8960552. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Foley, Scott)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON (Foley, Scott)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 4, 2022. (lcrbw2)
January 4, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC Answer to complaint due by 1/31/2022. Defendant INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON Answer to complaint due by 1/21/2022. (adh, )
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 31, 2022, the defendant Equifax Information Services LLC shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. It is further ORDERED that, in light of the parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time for Industrial Bank of Washington to File a Response, on or before January 21, 2022, the defendant Industrial Bank of Washington shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 4, 2022. (lcrbw2)
December 30, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. (Bender, Leslie)
December 30, 2021 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC (Bender, Leslie)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Carol Bender on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC (Bender, Leslie)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, For Extension of Time for Industrial Bank of Washington to File a Response by INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON. (Foley, Scott)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott W. Foley on behalf of INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON (Foley, Scott)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8901231) filed by FUNDA TOPCUOGLU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weiner, Courtney)
December 2, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOPCUOGLU v. INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FUNDA TOPCUOGLU
Represented By: Courtney L. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL BANK OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: David B. Applefeld
Represented By: Scott W. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Leslie Carol Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?