KAPLAN et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
Plaintiff: JONATHAN KAPLAN, JOHN NAPIER TYE, VALUES UNITED D/B/A WHISTLEBLOWER AID and VALUES UNITED doing business as WHISTLEBLOWER AID
Defendant: CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY and OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Case Number: 1:2021cv03306
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/9/2022. (tb)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent #12 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by March 9, 2022. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/10/22. (DJS)
February 9, 2022 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Answer or Other Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
January 27, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 1/27/2022 (Schulz, David)
January 25, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2022. (Schulz, David)
January 25, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/10/2022. (Schulz, David)
January 25, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 12/29/2021 (Schulz, David)
January 25, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 12/29/2021 (Schulz, David)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint,, filed by JONATHAN KAPLAN, VALUES UNITED, JOHN NAPIER TYE. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by VALUES UNITED, JOHN NAPIER TYE, JONATHAN KAPLAN.(Schulz, David)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb)
December 21, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to schulzd@ballardspahr.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zsb, )
December 17, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VALUES UNITED D/B/A WHISTLEBLOWER AID (Schulz, David)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8938353) filed by JONATHAN KAPLAN, VALUES UNITED D/B/A WHISTLEBLOWER AID, JOHN NAPIER TYE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Schulz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAPLAN et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN KAPLAN
Represented By: David A. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN NAPIER TYE
Represented By: David A. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALUES UNITED D/B/A WHISTLEBLOWER AID
Represented By: David A. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALUES UNITED doing business as WHISTLEBLOWER AID
Represented By: David A. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Represented By: Kenneth A. Adebonojo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?