BIRON v. GEORGE et al
Plaintiff: LISA A. BIRON
Defendant: MICHAEL CARVAJAL and LINDSEY GEORGE
Case Number: 1:2021cv03307
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Briefing Schedule by MICHAEL CARVAJAL, LINDSEY GEORGE. (Johnson, Stephanie)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 Receipt on 12/27/2021 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number: 2021 CA 004278 B. (zjf)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
December 21, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 004278 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by LINDSEY GEORGE, MICHAEL CARVAJAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Superior Court Documents Compl.)(Johnson, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIRON v. GEORGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA A. BIRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CARVAJAL
Represented By: Stephanie R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDSEY GEORGE
Represented By: Stephanie R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?