TAU v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
Plaintiff: Byron C. Tau and BYRON TAU
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND, U.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2021cv03329
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND.(Walker, Anna)
February 14, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Davis Walker on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Anna)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before March 7, 2022. So Ordered by by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 14, 2022. (lcdlf2)
February 9, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/14/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/13/2022. (Topic, Matthew)
February 9, 2022 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/14/2022. (Topic, Matthew)
February 9, 2022 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND served on 1/12/2022 (Topic, Matthew)
February 9, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND served on 1/10/2022 (Topic, Matthew)
February 9, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 1/13/2022 (Topic, Matthew)
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 1/13/2022 (Topic, Matthew)
February 9, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY served on 1/13/2022 (Topic, Matthew)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 1/13/2022 (Topic, Matthew)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court is ordered to withdraw the appearance of Joshua Burday on behalf of the plaintiff. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 1, 2022. (lcdlf2)
January 27, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Joshua Burday by BYRON TAU. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 28, 2021. (lcdlf2)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of Byron C. Tau (Topic, Matthew)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of Byron C. Tau (Burday, Joshua)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND, U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CDCDC-8943965) filed by Byron C. Tau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Burday, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAU v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron C. Tau
Represented By: Matthew Topic
Represented By: Joshua Hart Burday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BYRON TAU
Represented By: Matthew Topic
Represented By: Joshua Hart Burday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Anna Davis Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND
Represented By: Anna Davis Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. SOUTHERN COMMAND
Represented By: Anna Davis Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Represented By: Anna Davis Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Anna Davis Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Anna Davis Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?