JOHNSON v. SULLIVAN
Plaintiff: Juan Johnson
Defendant: Ryan Sullivan
Case Number: 1:2021cv03342
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Florence Y Pan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 8 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION to Stay filed by JUAN JOHNSON. (Ford, Yaida)
January 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenton Craig Welkener, Jr on behalf of RYAN SULLIVAN (Welkener, Kenton)
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay by RYAN SULLIVAN. (Mullen, Martha)
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RYAN SULLIVAN served on 1/4/2022, answer due 1/25/2022 (Ford, Yaida)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Ford, Yaida) Modified on 1/11/2022 (zjf).
January 11, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #4 Summons Returned Executed was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with the proof of service filled out. (zjf)
January 11, 2022 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #4 Summons Returned Executed was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading and select named defendant and not the radio button. (zjf)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to RYAN SULLIVAN. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 12/27/21. (lcrl)
December 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (zsb)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juan Johnson with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8945840) filed by Juan Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ford, Yaida) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/3/2022) (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Johnson
Represented By: Yaida O. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Sullivan
Represented By: Martha J. Mullen
Represented By: Kenton Craig Welkener, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?