JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Case Number: 1:2021cv03390
Filed: December 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Florence Y Pan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report proposing a schedule for litigation of this case on or before March 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 2/14/2022. (lcsw)
February 14, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2022. (zacr)
February 11, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Snyder, Cassie)
February 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassie Snyder on behalf of All Defendants (Snyder, Cassie)
January 22, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 1/21/2022 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Cotca, Ramona)
January 22, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/21/22. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Cotca, Ramona)
January 22, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/14/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Cotca, Ramona)
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znm)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 1/6/2022. (lcsw)
January 6, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (zsb)
December 31, 2021 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona)
December 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8956259) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, #3 Summons for US Attorney General, #4 Summons for U.S. Department of State)(Cotca, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Represented By: Ramona Raula Cotca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?