UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SANDWICH ISLES COMMUNICATIONS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: SANDWICH ISLES COMMUNICATIONS, INC., PA MAKANI LLC, HO'OPA'A INSURANCE, ALBERT S.N. HEE, CLEARCOM, INC. and WAIMANA ENTERPRISES, INC.
Petitioner: UNIVERSAL SERVICE ADMINISTRATION COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2021mc00071
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Referring Judge: G Michael Harvey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order to Show Cause, filed by ALBERT S.N. HEE. (ztth)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Mr. Hee shall show cause in writing, on or before August 4, 2021, why the Court should not consider the District of Hawaii's July 14, 2021 Discovery Order to be dispositive of the arguments raised in USAC's pending motion to quash. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 7/21/2021. (lcew)
July 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of a Ruling in the Underlying Action that is Dispositive of the Pending Motion to Quash by UNIVERSAL SERVICE ADMINISTRATION COMPANY (Attachments: #1 District Court of Hawaii's Order)(Barmak, David)
July 13, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2021 at 03:30 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. (lcew)
June 24, 2021 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. for full case management (adh, )
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL for full case management. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/24/2021. (lcjeb3)
June 24, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE (DECLARATION) by ALBERT S.N. HEE. (ztth)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by ALBERT S.N. HEE. (ztth)
June 21, 2021 Filing fee received: $ 49, receipt number: 200027. (zsb)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE Of Exhibit A attached to Reply by UNIVERSAL SERVICE ADMINISTRATION COMPANY re #2 Reply to opposition to Motion (Barmak, David)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 REPLY to opposition to motion re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by UNIVERSAL SERVICE ADMINISTRATION COMPANY. (Barmak, David)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash by UNIVERSAL SERVICE ADMINISTRATION COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A-F, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Barmak, David)
June 9, 2021 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Motion to Quash; emailed to DBarmak@mintz.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Filing fee for miscellaneous case not paid. Please remit filing fee payment via check or money order. In the future, do not file these kinds of cases electronically. (adh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SANDWICH ISLES COMMUNICATIONS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDWICH ISLES COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA MAKANI LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HO'OPA'A INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT S.N. HEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEARCOM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAIMANA ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNIVERSAL SERVICE ADMINISTRATION COMPANY
Represented By: David Barmak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?