GORKA v. THOMPSON, et al.,
Plaintiff: SEBASTIAN GORKA
Defendant: BENNIE G. THOMPSON, JOHN WOOD, TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL and VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00017
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC..(Figel, Reid)
January 31, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Partial Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(A) by SEBASTIAN GORKA (Warrington, David)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's notice of partial dismissal, Dkt. #16 , it is hereby ORDERED that all claims against Defendants John Wood and Timothy J. Heaphy are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/31/2022. (lcrdm3)
January 28, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Mason Figel on behalf of VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (Figel, Reid)
January 28, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Video (Zoom) Scheduling Conference held on 1/28/2022. For the reasons discussed on the record, no scheduling order will be entered at this time. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
January 26, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SEBASTIAN GORKA . (Warrington, David)
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Andrew Columbo on behalf of SEBASTIAN GORKA (Columbo, Michael)
January 26, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON, JOHN WOOD (Letter, Douglas)
January 25, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Status Conference by SEBASTIAN GORKA. (See Docket Entry #10 to view document). (znmw) Modified on 1/26/2022 (znmw).
January 25, 2022 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT Plaintiff Sebastian Gorka's Corrected Status Report and Request to Reschedule Status Conference by SEBASTIAN GORKA. (Warrington, David)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's status report, Dkt. #8 , it is hereby ORDERED that (1) the parties shall appear by video for a scheduling conference on January 28, 2022, at 10:30 a.m.; and (2) plaintiff shall promptly inform counsel for the defendants about the hearing. The parties may obtain Zoom log-in information for the scheduling conference from the Deputy Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/25/2022. (lcrdm3)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's corrected status report, Dkt. #10 , it is hereby ORDERED that (1) plaintiff's request to reschedule the video scheduling conference scheduled for January 28, 2022, at 10:30 a.m., is DENIED; and (2) plaintiff's counsel shall provide a copy of this order, along with the Courts prior order setting that scheduling conference, to each of the defendants in this matter. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/25/2022. (lcrdm3)
January 24, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY served on 1/24/2022; SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL served on 1/24/2022; BENNIE G. THOMPSON served on 1/24/2022; VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. served on 1/24/2022; JOHN WOOD served on 1/24/2022 (Columbo, Michael)
January 24, 2022 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by SEBASTIAN GORKA. (Warrington, David)
January 24, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., JOHN WOOD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(rj)
January 21, 2022 Filing 6 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Exhibit C by SEBASTIAN GORKA. (Warrington, David)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a status report on or before January 24, 2021, regarding (1) the status of plaintiff's efforts to effect service on the various defendants in this matter; (2) the status of the underlying controversy regarding disclosure of plaintiff's phone records; and (3) whether plaintiff anticipates filing a motion for a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction sometime in the next several days and, if so, when he will do so. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/21/2022. (lcrdm3)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/19/2022. (lcrdm3)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiff's motion to seal, Dkt. #2 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and the Clerk is directed to seal Exhibit C to the complaint, Dkt. [1-4]. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file a redacted copy of Exhibit C for the public docket on or before January 24, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/19/2022. (lcrdm3)
January 19, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 ERRATA Complaint by SEBASTIAN GORKA. (Warrington, David)
January 13, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint, #3 Errata; emailed to DWarrington@dhillonlaw.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA by SEBASTIAN GORKA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warrington, David) Modified on 1/14/2022 (zsb).
January 10, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to DWarrington@dhillonlaw.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document by SEBASTIAN GORKA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Order)(Warrington, David) Modified on 1/11/2022 to correct docket entry text (zsb).
January 6, 2022 Exparte document by SEBASTIAN GORKA. (Warrington, David)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8960326) filed by SEBASTIAN GORKA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Warrington, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GORKA v. THOMPSON, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEBASTIAN GORKA
Represented By: David Alan Warrington
Represented By: Michael Andrew Columbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENNIE G. THOMPSON
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WOOD
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Reid Mason Figel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?