HAILU et al v. MORRIS-HUGHES et al
Plaintiff: MULUGETA HAILU, MIZAN WEREDE, WILLIAM PERRY and YOHANNES WOUBE
Defendant: UNIQUE N MORRIS-HUGHES, MURIEL BOWSER and DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2022cv00020
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Amanda Newton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate Pursuant to LCVR 83.2(g))(Newton, Amanda)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Bowen Zhang on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Indigent Representation)(Zhang, Bowen)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE by Plaintiff Mulugeta Hailu of his Withdrawal of His Motion for Preliminary Injunction by MULUGETA HAILU re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Jarcho, Daniel)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to opposition to motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MULUGETA HAILU, WILLIAM PERRY, MIZAN WEREDE, YOHANNES WOUBE. (Jarcho, Daniel)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Memorandum in opposition to re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, UNIQUE N MORRIS-HUGHES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, January 5, 2022 Email to Hailu, #2 Exhibit B, Hailu Benefit Payment History, #3 Exhibit C, Hailu Determination Letter, #4 Exhibit D, Hailu Order for More Information, #5 Exhibit E, Hailu Final Order, #6 Exhibit F, Werede Payment Benefit History, #7 Exhibit G, PEUC Email, #8 Exhibit H, Werede Case Notes, #9 Exhibit I, Perry Determination Letter (Mar. 19, 2020), #10 Exhibit J, Perry Monetary Determination Form (Mar. 7, 2021), #11 Exhibit K, Perry Case Notes, #12 Exhibit L, Perry Final Order, #13 Exhibit M, Woube Monetary Determination Forms, #14 Exhibit N, Woube Benefit Payment History, #15 Exhibit O, Woube Final Order, #16 Exhibit P, Claimants Rights and Responsibilities, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Risher, Conrad)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA served on 1/12/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Process Server)(Bimmerle, Raechel)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNIQUE N MORRIS-HUGHES served on 1/12/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Process Server)(Bimmerle, Raechel)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on the Mayor of the District of Columbia. Date of Service Upon the Mayor for the District of Columbia on 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Process Server)(Bimmerle, Raechel)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 1/12/2022. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 2/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Process Server)(Bimmerle, Raechel)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION (Updated) of Yohannes Woube by MULUGETA HAILU, WILLIAM PERRY, MIZAN WEREDE, YOHANNES WOUBE re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by YOHANNES WOUBE, MIZAN WEREDE, MULUGETA HAILU, WILLIAM PERRY. (Bimmerle, Raechel)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants' response to the complaint shall be due 14 days after the court issues an order on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/18/2022. (lcapm2)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER entering the #13 Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule. Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction shall be filed on or before January 28, 2022, and plaintiffs' reply shall be filed on or before February 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/18/2022. (lcapm2)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, UNIQUE N MORRIS-HUGHES. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Risher, Conrad)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order by plaintiffs and by MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, UNIQUE N MORRIS-HUGHES. (Risher, Conrad)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Marie Rave on behalf of All Defendants (Rave, Helen)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall meet and confer and, by January 17, 2022, file a proposed schedule for briefing on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/13/2022. (lcapm2)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Conrad Z. Risher on behalf of All Defendants (Risher, Conrad)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to District of Columbia Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Drake B. Hagner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hagner, Drake)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Marcia Hollingsworth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 LCvR 83.2(g) Certification)(Hollingsworth, Marcia )
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, filed by YOHANNES WOUBE, MULUGETA HAILU, WILLIAM PERRY, MIZAN WEREDE. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by YOHANNES WOUBE, MIZAN WEREDE, MULUGETA HAILU, WILLIAM PERRY.(Bimmerle, Raechel)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, UNIQUE N MORRIS-HUGHES. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Raechel J. Bimmerle on behalf of MULUGETA HAILU, WILLIAM PERRY, MIZAN WEREDE, YOHANNES WOUBE (Attachments: #1 Certificate Pursuant to LCvR 83.2(g))(Bimmerle, Raechel)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Nicole Dooley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Related Case Form Certification Pursuant to LCvR 83.2(g))(Dooley, Nicole)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to daniel.jarcho@alston.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses- When naming a District of Columbia agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the DC Mayor & DC Attorney Gen (zsb, )
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer F. Mezey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mezey, Jennifer)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MULUGETA HAILU, WILLIAM PERRY, MIZAN WEREDE, YOHANNES WOUBE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Declaration of Mulugeta Hailu, #4 Declaration of Mizan Werede, #5 Declaration of Yohannes Woube, #6 Declaration of William Perry, #7 Declaration of Jeffrey Gutman, #8 Declaration of Jennifer Mezey, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Jarcho, Daniel)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MURIEL BOWSER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, UNIQUE N MORRIS-HUGHES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8961145) filed by YOHANNES WOUBE, MULUGETA HAILU, WILLIAM PERRY, MIZAN WEREDE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Jarcho, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAILU et al v. MORRIS-HUGHES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MULUGETA HAILU
Represented By: Daniel G. Jarcho
Represented By: Bowen Zhang
Represented By: Drake B. Hagner
Represented By: Jennifer F. Mezey
Represented By: Marcia Hollingsworth
Represented By: Nicole Dooley
Represented By: Raechel J. Bimmerle
Represented By: Amanda Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIZAN WEREDE
Represented By: Daniel G. Jarcho
Represented By: Raechel J. Bimmerle
Represented By: Amanda Newton
Represented By: Bowen Zhang
Represented By: Drake B. Hagner
Represented By: Jennifer F. Mezey
Represented By: Marcia Hollingsworth
Represented By: Nicole Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM PERRY
Represented By: Daniel G. Jarcho
Represented By: Raechel J. Bimmerle
Represented By: Amanda Newton
Represented By: Bowen Zhang
Represented By: Drake B. Hagner
Represented By: Jennifer F. Mezey
Represented By: Marcia Hollingsworth
Represented By: Nicole Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOHANNES WOUBE
Represented By: Daniel G. Jarcho
Represented By: Raechel J. Bimmerle
Represented By: Amanda Newton
Represented By: Bowen Zhang
Represented By: Drake B. Hagner
Represented By: Jennifer F. Mezey
Represented By: Marcia Hollingsworth
Represented By: Nicole Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIQUE N MORRIS-HUGHES
Represented By: Conrad Z. Risher
Represented By: Helen Marie Rave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MURIEL BOWSER
Represented By: Conrad Z. Risher
Represented By: Helen Marie Rave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Conrad Z. Risher
Represented By: Helen Marie Rave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?