FLORES v. DUCKETT et al
Plaintiff: RUDY FLORES
Defendant: NOAH DUCKETT and BYRON ALARCON
Case Number: 1:2022cv00022
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Florence Y Pan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by BYRON ALARCON, NOAH DUCKETT. (zjf)
February 22, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2022 at 2:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Florence Y. Pan. (zacr)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for April 7, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. via videoconference before Judge Florence Y. Pan. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 2/22/2022. (lcsw)
February 22, 2022 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Order Allowing Defendants' to Late File Their Answer to the Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc by BYRON ALARCON, NOAH DUCKETT. (Attachments: #1 Defendants, Answer to Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, David)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Consent MOTION for Order Allowing Defendants to Late File Their Answer to the Complaint. Defendants' Answer is accepted for filing. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 2/22/2022. (lcsw)
February 10, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Jackson on behalf of NOAH DUCKETT (Jackson, David)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants' response to the Complaint is due on February 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 2/8/2022. (lcsw)
February 8, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to the Complaint due by 2/18/2022. (zacr)
February 7, 2022 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by NOAH DUCKETT. (Welkener, Kenton)
February 4, 2022 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BYRON ALARCON served on 1/28/2022, answer due 2/18/2022 (Shrewsbury, Diane)
February 4, 2022 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NOAH DUCKETT served on 1/15/2022, answer due 2/5/2022 (Shrewsbury, Diane)
January 28, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Kutnik-Bauder on behalf of RUDY FLORES (Kutnik-Bauder, Jacqueline)
January 24, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Preston L. Pugh on behalf of RUDY FLORES (Pugh, Preston) (Main Document 13 replaced on 1/25/2022) (zjf).
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Preston Pugh is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 1/13/2022. (lcrl)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Carlos Andino is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 1/13/2022. (lcrl)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Jacqueline Kutnik-Bauder is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 1/13/2022. (lcrl)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 1/12/2022. (lcrl)
January 12, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to BYRON ALARCON, NOAH DUCKETT. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
January 12, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (znmg)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 ERRATA by RUDY FLORES re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Carlos Andino, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8965143. Fee Status: Fee Paid. filed by RUDY FLORES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Corkery, Dennis)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 ERRATA by RUDY FLORES re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jacqueline Kutnik-Bauder, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8965136. Fee Status: Fee Paid. filed by RUDY FLORES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Corkery, Dennis)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 ERRATA Declaration by RUDY FLORES re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Preston Pugh, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8966936. Fee Status: Fee Paid. filed by RUDY FLORES. (Shrewsbury, Diane)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 ERRATA Complaint by RUDY FLORES re #1 Complaint, filed by RUDY FLORES. (Shrewsbury, Diane)
January 10, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #4 , #5 , and #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; emailed to dennis_corkery@washlaw.org, dshrewsbury@crowell.com, cc'd 9 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. The Declaration must have an original, handwritten signature. Please file the signed Declarations using the event Errata and attach a Proposed Order for motions #4 and #5 .., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
January 10, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to dshrewsbury@crowell.com, cc'd 9 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. The complaint was not signed by the filing attorney., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Preston Pugh, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8966936. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RUDY FLORES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shrewsbury, Diane)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Carlos Andino, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8965143. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RUDY FLORES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carlos Andino)(Corkery, Dennis)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jacqueline Kutnik-Bauder, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8965136. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RUDY FLORES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacqueline Kutnik-Bauder)(Corkery, Dennis)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Corkery on behalf of RUDY FLORES (Corkery, Dennis)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Aimee Shrewsbury on behalf of RUDY FLORES (Shrewsbury, Diane)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8961912) filed by RUDY FLORES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Noah Duckett, #3 Summons Byron Alarcon)(Shrewsbury, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLORES v. DUCKETT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUDY FLORES
Represented By: Dennis A. Corkery
Represented By: Diane Aimee Shrewsbury
Represented By: Preston L. Pugh
Represented By: Jacqueline Kutnik-Bauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOAH DUCKETT
Represented By: David A. Jackson
Represented By: Kenton Craig Welkener, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYRON ALARCON
Represented By: David A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?