STRAUSS et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Plaintiff: JOEY STRAUSS, JEAN STRAUSS, JACOBUS STRAUSS, IRIS POTGIETER, NICHOLAS POTGIETER, WESSEL POTGIETER, ADRI DU PREEZ, STEPHNE HARTSLIEF, CHARNE BELL, CHANTELLE DU PREEZ, JACOB ZUCCARO, JAMES ZUCCARO, JAMIE ZUCCARO, BLAKE DARSOW, JACQUES BOTHA, JOHANNES T POTGIETER and JOHANNES T. POTGIETER
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Case Number: 1:2022cv00052
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1605 A Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by the Clerk of the Court re #8 Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing. Clerk's Office is unable to effect service via the U.S. Post Office. Documents have been returned to counsel. (zjf)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING under 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3) by CHARNE BELL, JACQUES BOTHA, BLAKE DARSOW, ADRI DU PREEZ, CHANTELLE DU PREEZ, STEPHNE HARTSLIEF, IRIS POTGIETER, JOHANNES T. POTGIETER, NICHOLAS POTGIETER, WESSEL POTGIETER, JACOBUS STRAUSS, JEAN STRAUSS, JOEY STRAUSS, JACOB ZUCCARO, JAMES ZUCCARO, JAMIE ZUCCARO. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter to Clerk)(Hoffman, Kevin)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by CHARNE BELL, JACQUES BOTHA, BLAKE DARSOW, ADRI DU PREEZ, CHANTELLE DU PREEZ, STEPHNE HARTSLIEF, IRIS POTGIETER, JOHANNES T. POTGIETER, NICHOLAS POTGIETER, WESSEL POTGIETER, JACOBUS STRAUSS, JEAN STRAUSS, JOEY STRAUSS, JACOB ZUCCARO, JAMES ZUCCARO, JAMIE ZUCCARO re #6 Order on Motion for Waiver, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Hoffman, Kevin)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Waiver. Plaintiffs shall file, under seal, a notice listing the full legal names and corresponding residence addresses of all plaintiffs within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/04/2022. (lcrcl1)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (znmg)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy D. Singer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Randy)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Waiver of Local Rule 5.1(c)(1) by CHARNE BELL, JACQUES BOTHA, BLAKE DARSOW, ADRI DU PREEZ, CHANTELLE DU PREEZ, STEPHNE HARTSLIEF, IRIS POTGIETER, JOHANNES T POTGIETER, NICHOLAS POTGIETER, WESSEL POTGIETER, JACOBUS STRAUSS, JEAN STRAUSS, JOEY STRAUSS, JACOB ZUCCARO, JAMES ZUCCARO, JAMIE ZUCCARO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Kevin)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:20cv1227. (Hoffman, Kevin)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8969088) filed by JACOB ZUCCARO, ADRI DU PREEZ, JEAN STRAUSS, JOHANNES T POTGIETER, JOEY STRAUSS, JAMIE ZUCCARO, WESSEL POTGIETER, JACOBUS STRAUSS, CHARNE BELL, JAMES ZUCCARO, JACQUES BOTHA, BLAKE DARSOW, STEPHNE HARTSLIEF, IRIS POTGIETER, CHANTELLE DU PREEZ, NICHOLAS POTGIETER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hoffman, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRAUSS et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEY STRAUSS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN STRAUSS
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOBUS STRAUSS
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRIS POTGIETER
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS POTGIETER
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESSEL POTGIETER
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRI DU PREEZ
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHNE HARTSLIEF
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARNE BELL
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANTELLE DU PREEZ
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB ZUCCARO
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ZUCCARO
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIE ZUCCARO
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLAKE DARSOW
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUES BOTHA
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHANNES T POTGIETER
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHANNES T. POTGIETER
Represented By: Randy D. Singer
Represented By: Kevin Allin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?