POWELL v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Plaintiff: LEMUEL POWELL
Defendant: WMATA and WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Case Number: 1:2022cv00169
Filed: January 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Dabney L Friedrich
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 10 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Goren, Jason)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' #10 Meet and Confer Statement, in which they consented to assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge for all purposes, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73(a) and 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1), this matter shall be assigned to a Magistrate Judge for all purposes, including trial. The Court defers to the Magistrate Judge in setting deadlines for further proceedings in this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 14, 2022. (lcdlf2)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 Receipt on 2/17/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 000003 V. (zeg)
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Meet and Confer Report by LEMUEL POWELL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goren, Jason)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's #8 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Local Civil Rule 16.3 Joint Meet and Confer Report. The parties shall file, on or before March 17, 2022, a joint meet and confer report as set forth in Local Civil Rule 16.3(d). So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 2, 2022. (lcdlf2)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 1, 2022. (lcdlf2)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the parties shall confer in accordance with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3 and file, on or before February 15, 2022, a joint meet and confer report as set forth in Local Civil Rule 16.3(d). After receiving the joint meet and confer report, the Court will set a scheduling conference unless the Court determines, on the basis of the report, that a conference is unnecessary. See Local Civil Rule 16.4. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 1, 2022. (lcdlf2)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Hayes Chandonnet on behalf of WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Chandonnet, Brendan) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/31/2022) (zeg).
January 31, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Goren on behalf of LEMUEL POWELL (Goren, Jason)
January 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
January 27, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb)
January 25, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WMATA.(Chandonnet, Brendan)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WMATA (Chandonnet, Brendan)
January 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from DC SUPERIOR, case number 2022 CA 000003 V Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9001414 filed by WMATA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit COMPLAINT, #3 Summons, #4 Superior Court Documents, #5 Superior Court Documents)(Chandonnet, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POWELL v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEMUEL POWELL
Represented By: Jason Goren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMATA
Represented By: Brendan Hayes Chandonnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: Brendan Hayes Chandonnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?