BOONE-MERCER et al v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Plaintiff: SCHERAZADE BOONE-MERCER, JBM, JM, MM3, CBM, J.B.M., J.M., M.M.3 and C.B.M.
Defendant: WMATA and WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Case Number: 1:2022cv00185
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/16/2022. (lctnm2)
March 16, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to the Show Cause Order due by 3/31/2022. (hmc)
March 16, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc)
March 15, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY.(Janey, Neal)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant's time to file a response to the [1-3] Complaint expired on March 1, 2022. See Min. Order, Jan. 31, 2022. Yet the Defendant has filed no such response. The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendant shall, by March 31, 2022, SHOW CAUSE as to why Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant should not be treated as conceded. Defendant may comply with this Order by filing a response to the Complaint. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of sanctions against Defendant. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/15/2022. (lctnm2)
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 Receipt on 2/17/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 004711 V. (zeg)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/31/22. (lctnm2)
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (znmg)
January 31, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to the Complaint due by 3/1/2022. (hmc)
January 31, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court directs Defendant to respond to the Complaint by March 1, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/31/22. (lctnm2)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WMATA (Janey, Neal)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 004711 V Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9006006 filed by WMATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filing of Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Initial Order & Addendum, #5 Exhibit Summons, #6 Exhibit DC Civil Cover Sheet)(Janey, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOONE-MERCER et al v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCHERAZADE BOONE-MERCER
Represented By: David Errol Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JBM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MM3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.B.M.
Represented By: David Errol Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M.
Represented By: David Errol Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.3
Represented By: David Errol Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.B.M.
Represented By: David Errol Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMATA
Represented By: Neal Marcellas Janey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: Neal Marcellas Janey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?