RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Plaintiff: RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEB HAALAND, BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, AMANDA LEFTON, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, CHRISTINE WORMUTH, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS and JAMIE A. PINKHAM
Petitioner: VINEYARD WIND 1 LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00237
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY to opposition to motion re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts filed by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Massachusetts Amicus Brief)(Rosen, Perry)
February 28, 2022 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT served on 2/10/2022; DEB HAALAND served on 2/11/2022; AMANDA LEFTON served on 2/11/2022; NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE served on 2/10/2022; JAMIE A. PINKHAM served on 2/7/2022; RICHARD W. SPINRAD served on 2/10/2022; UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS served on 2/11/2022; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY served on 2/17/2022; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 2/11/2022; CHRISTINE WORMUTH served on 2/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Marzulla, Nancie)
February 28, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/16/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Marzulla, Nancie)
February 28, 2022 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Marzulla, Nancie)
February 25, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Intervene filed by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE. (Marzulla, Nancie)
February 25, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts filed by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzulla, Nancie)
February 18, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Jacek Declaration, #4 Affidavit Harrison Declaration, #5 Affidavit Pentony Declaration, #6 Exhibit Allco Complaint, #7 Exhibit Ack Residents Complaint, #8 Exhibit Allco Scheduling Order, #9 Exhibit Ack Residents Scheduling Order, #10 Exhibit Pet. for Review in 1st Circuit, #11 Exhibit Motion to Stay 1st Circuit Action, #12 Exhibit Status Report in 1st Circuit, #13 Affidavit Bennett Declaration)(Rosen, Perry)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby sets the following expedited briefing schedule for Defendants' #10 Motion to Transfer: plaintiffs shall file their response by 2/25/2022; defendants shall file their reply by 3/4/2022. SO ORDERED by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/18/2022. (lccrc1)
February 17, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT, DEB HAALAND, AMANDA LEFTON, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, JAMIE A. PINKHAM, RICHARD W. SPINRAD, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, CHRISTINE WORMUTH. (Rosen, Perry)
February 15, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marzulla, Nancie)
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry M. Rosen on behalf of All Defendants (Rosen, Perry)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VINEYARD WIND 1 LLC (Buente, David)
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene by VINEYARD WIND 1 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Moeller in Support, #3 Declaration of Pachter in Support, #4 Proposed Answer, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Buente, David)
February 3, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(rj)
February 1, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb)
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE (Marzulla, Nancie)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE. Case related to Case No. 21-3276. (Marzulla, Nancie)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9013212) filed by RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Marzulla, Nancie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESPONSIBLE OFFSHORE DEVELOPMENT ALLIANCE
Represented By: Nancie G. Marzulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEB HAALAND
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF OCEAN ENERGY MANAGEMENT
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA LEFTON
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD W. SPINRAD
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE WORMUTH
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE A. PINKHAM
Represented By: Perry M. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VINEYARD WIND 1 LLC
Represented By: David T. Buente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?