CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE and SAVE THE MANATEE CLUB
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2022cv00246
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1540 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER entering Settlement Agreement. See attached Order for details. The Clerk of Court is requested to close the case. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/1/22. (lctnm2)
June 1, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION Settlement Agreement by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Whitlock, Ragan)
April 7, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 6/24/2022. (hmc)
April 6, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Mark)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond by June 24, 2022 to the #1 Complaint. Further extensions will be disfavored. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/6/22. (lctnm2)
March 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ragan Whitlock on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Whitlock, Ragan) (Main Document 12 replaced on 3/11/2022) (zeg).
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 44.5(a). #Click here for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/1/22. (lctnm2)
February 28, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ragan Whitlock, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9070589. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, SAVE THE MANATEE CLUB. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ragan Whitlock, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez, Jaclyn)
February 18, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/17/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Lopez, Jaclyn)
February 18, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/16/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Lopez, Jaclyn)
February 18, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 2/15/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Lopez, Jaclyn)
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M. Harvey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harvey, Anne)
February 3, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znm)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/1/22. (lctnm2)
February 1, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anne M. Harvey, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9015711. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, SAVE THE MANATEE CLUB. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anne M. Harvey, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davenport, Jane)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane P. Davenport on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davenport, Jane)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, SAVE THE MANATEE CLUB (Lopez, Jaclyn)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9014121) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, SAVE THE MANATEE CLUB, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service, #3 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons to U.S. Attorney for DDC)(Lopez, Jaclyn)
February 1, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/1/22. (lctnm2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY et al v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Jane P. Davenport
Represented By: Jaclyn Lopez
Represented By: Anne M. Harvey
Represented By: Ragan Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Represented By: Jane P. Davenport
Represented By: Jaclyn Lopez
Represented By: Anne M. Harvey
Represented By: Ragan Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAVE THE MANATEE CLUB
Represented By: Jane P. Davenport
Represented By: Jaclyn Lopez
Represented By: Anne M. Harvey
Represented By: Ragan Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?