MORGAN-NICHOLSON v. SUAREZ et al
Plaintiff: JOAN ELIZABETH MORGAN-NICHOLSON PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ORAL ANGELO NICHOLSON and JOAN ELIZABETH MORGAN-NICHOLSON
Defendant: EMILIO SUAREZ, Emilio Suarez Senzano and H&S HAULING LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00473
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Initial disclosures shall be exchanged by April 25, 2022; 2) The pleadings shall be amended by June 3, 2022; 3) Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures shall be due by July 5, 2022; 4) Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures shall be due by August 5, 2022; 5) Plaintiff's rebuttal Expert Disclosures shall be due by August 19, 2022; 6) Discovery shall close by October 3, 2022; and 7) A post-discovery status hearing is scheduled for October 14, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/4/2022. (lcjeb3)
April 4, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Video Initial Scheduling Conference held on 4/4/2022. Post Discovery Status Conference set for 10/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (nbn)
April 4, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial Disclosure due by 4/25/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2022. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/5/2022. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 8/5/2022. Expert Disclosures due by 8/19/2022. Discovery due by 10/3/2022. (nbn)
March 31, 2022 Filing 10 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (McCollum, James)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference is set for April 4, 2022, at 10 a.m. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. Chambers will contact the parties with dial-in information. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/2/2022. (lcjeb3)
March 2, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn)
March 1, 2022 Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Hoffman, Joshua); Modified text and docketing event on 3/2/2022 (ztth).
March 1, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by H&S HAULING LLC, EMILIO SUAREZ SENZANO, EMILIO SUAREZ.(Hoffman, Joshua)
March 1, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Amit Kumar Sharma on behalf of JOAN ELIZABETH MORGAN-NICHOLSON (Sharma, Amit)
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. McCollum, Jr on behalf of JOAN ELIZABETH MORGAN-NICHOLSON (McCollum, James)
February 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (znmg)
February 25, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (znmg)
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Certification of Notice of Removal to DC Superior Court by H&S HAULING LLC, EMILIO SUAREZ SENZANO, EMILIO SUAREZ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hoffman, Joshua)
February 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Hoffman on behalf of H&S HAULING LLC, EMILIO SUAREZ SENZANO, EMILIO SUAREZ (Hoffman, Joshua)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 ERRATA Notice of Removal by H&S HAULING LLC, EMILIO SUAREZ SENZANO, EMILIO SUAREZ re Notice of QC- New Case,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hoffman, Joshua)
February 24, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to jhoffman@fandpnet.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Pleading filed as attachment. Please file pleading as separate entry., 3. Notice of Appearance must be filed as separate docket entry using the event Notice of Appearance (under Notices)., 4. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 004697 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9060636 filed by H&S HAULING LLC, Emilio Suarez Senzano, EMILIO SUAREZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Certification of Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Appearance)(Hoffman, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORGAN-NICHOLSON v. SUAREZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN ELIZABETH MORGAN-NICHOLSON PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ORAL ANGELO NICHOLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN ELIZABETH MORGAN-NICHOLSON
Represented By: James E. McCollum, Jr.
Represented By: Amit Kumar Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILIO SUAREZ
Represented By: Joshua M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilio Suarez Senzano
Represented By: Joshua M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&S HAULING LLC
Represented By: Joshua M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?