CHAMPAGNE v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JESSICA CHAMPAGNE
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., GABRIEL TAZA, RASIER, LLC, RASIER-CA, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC and GABRIEL TAZA ASABA LEKELEFAC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00534
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc., RaiserCA, LLC, Rasier, LLC, and Rasier-DC, LLC filed on the docket a copy of their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures. See ECF No. #19 . But discovery may not be filed on the docket. See LCvR 5.2(a). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' #19 Rule 26(a)(1) statement is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/26/2022. (lctjk1)
April 25, 2022 Filing 19 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 4/26/2022..... RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Saltzman, Jonathan) Modified to strike on 4/27/2022 (zkh).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/21/2022. (lctjk1)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/8/2022. (lctjk1)
April 8, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference held on 4/8/2022. Scheduling order to be entered by the court. Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 11/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (zkh)
April 5, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Saltzman on behalf of RASIER, LLC, RASIER-CA, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Saltzman, Jonathan)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc., Raiser, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, and Rasier-DC, LLC's #14 Consent Motion to Extend Deadline for Joint Report. It is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc and for good cause shown, that Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/5/2022. (lctjk1)
April 4, 2022 Filing 15 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Wight, Britton)
April 1, 2022 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Report by RASIER, LLC, RASIER-CA, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Brigitte)
March 21, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by RASIER, LLC, RASIER-CA, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.(ztth)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc., Raiser, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, and Rasier-DC, LLC's #12 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that, for good cause shown, Defendants' motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket ECF No. 12-1 as Defendants Uber Technologies, Inc., Raiser, LLC, Rasier-CA, LLC, and Rasier-DC, LLC's Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/21/2022. (lctjk1)
March 17, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend Answer to Complaint by RASIER, LLC, RASIER-CA, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Brigitte); Modified docketing relief and text on 3/18/2022 (ztth).
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' #11 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer. Defendants' #11 Motion does not comply with Local Civil Rule 7(m), which requires in the motion a statement that Defendants conferred with Plaintiff to "determine whether there is any opposition to the relief sought" and indicating "whether the motion is opposed." Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' #11 Motion is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/16/2022. (lctjk1)
March 15, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to Complaint by RASIER, LLC, RASIER-CA, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Brigitte)
March 14, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2022 at 2:00 PM before Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zkh)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that an Initial Scheduling Conference is set for April 8, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. via teleconference. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. The parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at (202) 354-3495 at least one business day prior to the hearing to make arrangements to participate. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/14/2022. (lctjk1)
March 11, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by GABRIEL TAZA ASABA LEKELEFAC.(Wight, Britton)
March 7, 2022 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RASIER, LLC, RASIER-CA, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC (Smith, Brigitte)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by RASIER, LLC, RASIER-CA, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(Smith, Brigitte)
March 4, 2022 Filing 9 Receipt on 3/4/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2021 CA 004581 V. (ztth)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Gabriel Taza Asaba Lekelefac a/k/a Gabriel Taza (Lekelefac). It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendant Gabriel Taza Asaba Lekelefac by April 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/4/2022. (lctjk1)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE Adding Exhibit 3 to Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Serve by JESSICA CHAMPAGNE re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Lekelefac (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order granting MTE)(Cornoni, Paul)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GABRIEL TAZA ASABA LEKELEFAC served on 3/2/2022, answer due 3/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit receipt of hand delivery, #2 Exhibit copy of envelope)(Cornoni, Paul)
March 3, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Lekelefac by JESSICA CHAMPAGNE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Report of process server)(Cornoni, Paul)
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal. (znmg)
March 3, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (znmg)
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. filed by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC..(Smith, Brigitte)
March 2, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to brigitte.smith@wilsonelser.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 2. The civil cover sheet should be filed in a non-fillable PDF format. After completing the form, you will need to print to PDF so that the fillable fields can no longer be edited., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2021 CA 004581 V Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9070751 filed by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Smith, Brigitte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAMPAGNE v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA CHAMPAGNE
Represented By: Paul J. Cornoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Represented By: Jonathan Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRIEL TAZA
Represented By: Britton Robert Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASIER, LLC
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Represented By: Jonathan Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASIER-CA, LLC
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Represented By: Jonathan Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASIER-DC, LLC
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Represented By: Jonathan Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRIEL TAZA ASABA LEKELEFAC
Represented By: Britton Robert Wight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?