BROTHERS v. CVS
Plaintiff: Zachariah Brothers
Defendant: CVS and DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA CVS PHARMACY, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00549
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CVS. Attorney Cori Schreider terminated. (Schreider, Cori)
April 1, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 4/25/2022. (tj)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order advising plaintiff to respond by April 25, 2022, to defendant's motion to dismiss or risk dismissal of the case (see document for details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/31/2022.(psu1)
March 8, 2022 Filing 5 Receipt on 3/8/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 000461 B. (ztth)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint) by CVS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schreider, Cori)
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
March 3, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb)
March 1, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CVS identifying Corporate Parent CVS PHARMACY, INC., Corporate Parent CVS HEALTH CORPORATION for CVS. (zsb)
March 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for DC, case number 2022-CA-000461 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9072773 filed by CVS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint & Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 -Corporate Disclosure, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit 4 - civil cover sheet)(Burns, Scott) Modified on 3/3/2022 to correct docket entry text (zsb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROTHERS v. CVS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachariah Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS
Represented By: Cori Schreider
Represented By: Scott Patrick Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA CVS PHARMACY, L.L.C.
Represented By: Scott Patrick Burns
Represented By: Cori Schreider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?