WANG et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Plaintiff: XIYUE WANG, HUA QU, XIYUE WANG AND HUA QU, KEXU LAN and S.Q.
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Case Number: 1:2022cv00583
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1605 A Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING pursuant to 28 USC 1608(a)(3) as to IRAN by KEXU LAN, HUA QU, S.Q., XIYUE WANG. (Kalik, Tracy)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/25/2022. (lctjk3)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET by XIYUE WANG, KEXU LAN, S.Q., HUA QU re Notice of QC- New Case,, filed by XIYUE WANG, KEXU LAN, S.Q., HUA QU. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,,.(Kalik, Tracy)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint re: Civil Cover Sheet; emailed to rdheideman@hnklaw.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format., 2. The civil cover sheet should be filed in a non-fillable PDF format. After completing the form, you will need to print to PDF. Please file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (znmg)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Tipograph on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tipograph, Joseph)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Noel Jason Nudelman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nudelman, Noel)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Reichman Kalik on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kalik, Tracy)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Waiver of Local Rule 5.1(e) by KEXU LAN, HUA QU, XIYUE WANG, XIYUE WANG AND HUA QU. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalik, Tracy)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9079635) filed by XIYUE WANG, KEXU LAN, XIYUE WANG AND HUA QU, HUA QU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Heideman, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/10/2022) (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WANG et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIYUE WANG
Represented By: Joseph Tipograph
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUA QU
Represented By: Joseph Tipograph
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIYUE WANG AND HUA QU
Represented By: Joseph Tipograph
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEXU LAN
Represented By: Joseph Tipograph
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.Q.
Represented By: Joseph Tipograph
Represented By: Noel Jason Nudelman
Represented By: Tracy Reichman Kalik
Represented By: Richard D. Heideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?