AGARWAL v. CENTRAL ISLAND HEALTHCARE
Plaintiff: RANJANA AGARWAL
Defendant: CENTRAL ISLAND HEALTHCARE
Case Number: 1:2022cv00609
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2022 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CENTRAL ISLAND HEALTHCARE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Terranova, Jodi)
April 8, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by CENTRAL ISLAND HEALTHCARE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
April 1, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by RANJANA AGARWAL. (Croner, Andrew)
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew William Croner on behalf of RANJANA AGARWAL (Croner, Andrew)
March 23, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/11/2022. (tb)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Consent #4 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by April 11, 2022. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/22/22. (DJS)
March 10, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CENTRAL ISLAND HEALTHCARE re #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . (Terranova, Jodi)
March 10, 2022 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CENTRAL ISLAND HEALTHCARE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Terranova, Jodi)
March 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zsb)
March 10, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by CENTRAL ISLAND HEALTHCARE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Terranova, Jodi) Modified event title on 3/11/2022 (znmw).
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court Nassau County, State of New York, case number 600698/2022 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9083242 filed by CENTRAL ISLAND HEALTHCARE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Terranova, Jodi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGARWAL v. CENTRAL ISLAND HEALTHCARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANJANA AGARWAL
Represented By: Joseph Ciaccio
Represented By: Andrew William Croner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL ISLAND HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Jodi V. Terranova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?