ALLEN v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Plaintiff: LEON ALLEN
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Case Number: 1:2022cv00633
Filed: March 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Allen, Geoffrey)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that an Initial Scheduling Conference is set for May 9, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. via teleconference. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. The parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at (202) 354-3495 at least one business day prior to the hearing to make arrangements to participate. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/8/2022. (lctjk3)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/25/2022. (lctjk3)
March 11, 2022 Filing 5 Receipt on 3/11/2022 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 2022 CA 000422 V sent by D.C. Superior Court. (ztth) (ztth). Modified to add document on 3/15/2022 (ztth).
March 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh)
March 10, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmh)
March 8, 2022 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Cuthbertson, James)
March 8, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Douglas Cuthbertson on behalf of WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Cuthbertson, James)
March 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9090451 filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Superior Court Documents Complaint, #3 Superior Court Documents Summons, #4 Superior Court Documents Information Sheet, #5 Superior Court Documents Initial Order, #6 Superior Court Documents Answer)(Cuthbertson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEN v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEON ALLEN
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: James Douglas Cuthbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?