PICKUP et al v. BIDEN et al
Plaintiff: DAVID PICKUP, DAREN MEHL, STEPHEN BLACK, GREG QUINLAN, CHRIS SEVIER and RICH PENKOSKI
Defendant: JOE R. BIDEN, JEFF MERKLEY, CHARLES SCHUMER, RICHARD J. DURBIN, DAVID CICILLINE and NANCY PELOSI
Case Number: 1:2022cv00859
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Filing 21 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOE R. BIDEN served on 5/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit service of process proof through an authorized electronic means as permitted by procedural rules in view of the pandemic)(SEVIER, CHRIS)
May 18, 2022 Filing 20 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DAVID CICILLINE served on 5/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of communications with the Defendants authorized agents, #2 Exhibit Proof of communications with Defendant's authorized agents)(SEVIER, CHRIS)
May 18, 2022 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NANCY PELOSI served on 5/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof that Defendant Pelosi agreed to accept service electronically instead of in person)(SEVIER, CHRIS)
May 18, 2022 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/17/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit The steps to serve the US Attorneys office electronically)(SEVIER, CHRIS)
May 18, 2022 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RICHARD J. DURBIN served on 5/17/2022 (SEVIER, CHRIS)
May 18, 2022 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHARLES SCHUMER served on 5/17/2022 (SEVIER, CHRIS)
May 18, 2022 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JEFF MERKLEY served on 5/17/2022 (SEVIER, CHRIS)
May 18, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRIS SEVIER served on 5/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Confirmation that Defendant Pelosi's agreed to be served electronically instead of in person)(SEVIER, CHRIS)
May 11, 2022 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Standing Order. Sent to Rich Penkoski; New Address: Unknown. (hmc)
May 5, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by CHRIS SEVIER (SEVIER, CHRIS)
May 5, 2022 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 4/6/2022 Minute Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password; Sent to Rich Penkoski; New Address: Unknown. (hmc)
May 5, 2022 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 4/6/2022 Minute Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password; Sent to David Pickup; New Address: Unknown. (hmc)
May 5, 2022 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Standing Order; Sent to David Pickup; New Address: Unknown. (hmc)
April 11, 2022 Filing 8 DECLARATION Stephen Black, Executive Director of First Stone Ministries by CHRIS SEVIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A book by Stephen Black - Freedom Realized - finding freedom from homosexuality & Living a Life Free from labels - summarized in his declaration., #2 Exhibit First Stone Ministries Effectiveness Survey - Full Report - summarized in the declaration)(SEVIER, CHRIS)
April 10, 2022 Filing 7 DECLARATION CORRECTED Of Daren Mehl, President Of Voice Of The Voiceless, DE #6 Was uploaded in error by CHRIS SEVIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition Reverse Amazon's decision to censor alternative views on Homosexuality. Change.org, #2 Exhibit Changed Book Testimonies, #3 Exhibit Differing Views on Christian Doctrine, Identity and Homosexuality, #4 Exhibit Christian Post - Facebook restores Christian ministries' pages after being 'incorrectly removed', #5 Exhibit Absence of Behavioral Harm Following Non-efficacious Sexual Orientation Change Efforts: A Retrospective Study of United States Sexual Minority Adults, 20162018, #6 Exhibit National Task Force for Therapy Equality Report to the Federal Trade Commission, #7 Exhibit What is "ex-gay" and why do their books matter?, #8 Exhibit The APA'S deceptive science - Voice of the Voiceless, #9 Two Prisms - Blogs and bits)(SEVIER, CHRIS)
April 10, 2022 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Daren Mehl, President of Voice Of The Voiceless by CHRIS SEVIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amazon Censors alternative views on Homosexuality, #2 Exhibit Changed Book Testimonies, #3 Exhibit Differing Views on Christian Doctrine, Identity and Homosexuality, #4 Exhibit Facebook restores Christian ministries' pages after being 'incorrectly removed', #5 Exhibit Frontiers in Psychology - Absence of Behavioral Harm Following Non-efficacious Sexual Orientation Change Efforts: A Retrospective Study of United States Sexual Minority Adults, 20162018, #6 Exhibit National Task Force for Therapy Equality Report to the Federal Trade Commission May 2, 2017 In Their Own Words Lies, Deception, anD FrauD, #7 Exhibit What is "ex-gay" and why do their books matter?, #8 Exhibit The APA'S deceptive science - Voice of the Voiceless, #9 Exhibit Blog - What is Conversation Therapy)(SEVIER, CHRIS)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff Sevier's #3 Motion for CM/ECF Password. The CM/ECF password may be used only by Sevier, who shall file joint motions/briefs on behalf of all Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs may not file separate briefs or motions without prior leave of the Court. Sevier shall limit his electronic filings to documents that are relevant and required by Court order, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Civil Rules of this Court, and he shall refrain from filing documents that are frivolous or vexatious. Plaintiff is responsible for monitoring his e-mail account, retrieving electronic filings, and ensuring the accuracy of the official docket entry generated by the CM/ECF software. The Clerk may direct plaintiff to re-file any document that has been filed incorrectly or to correct any docket entry that is erroneous or inaccurate. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/6/2022. (lctnm3)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 DECLARATION by GREG QUINLAN. "Leave to file GRANTED" Signed by Trevor N. McFadden on 4/5/2022. (zeg)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/31/22. (lctnm3)
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for CM/ECF Password by CHRIS SEVIER. (zeg)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 DECLARATION by RICH PENKOSKI. (zeg)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOE R. BIDEN, DAVID CICILLINE, RICHARD J. DURBIN, JEFF MERKLEY, NANCY PELOSI, CHARLES SCHUMER ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 201841) filed by RICH PENKOSKI, STEPHEN BLACK, DAREN MEHL, DAVID PICKUP, GREG QUINLAN, CHRIS SEVIER. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration) (zeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PICKUP et al v. BIDEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID PICKUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAREN MEHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREG QUINLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS SEVIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICH PENKOSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE R. BIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF MERKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES SCHUMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD J. DURBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID CICILLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY PELOSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?