BURRS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: JONATHAN R. BURRS
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, SEYFARTH SHAW, LLP, CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION and WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENTS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00895
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 USCA Case Number 22-5128 for #7 Notice of Appeal filed by JONATHAN R. BURRS. (zeg)
May 6, 2022 Filing 8 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re #7 Notice of Appeal. (zeg)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL by JONATHAN R. BURRS. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 202080. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (zeg)
April 19, 2022 Filing 6 Objection re #4 Notice of Related Case filed by JONATHAN R. BURRS. "Leave to file GRANTED" Signed by Judge Trevor N. Mcfadden on 4/19/2022. (zeg)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, Plaintiff's #1 Complaint is DISMISSED. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/18/22. (lctnm2)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, SEYFARTH SHAW, LLP, WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENTS, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:22-cv-00512-RDM. (Costantino, Christine)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/4/22. (lctnm2)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to use a USPS PO BOX by JONATHAN R. BURRS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(zeg)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, SEYFARTH SHAW, LLP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENTS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 201860) with Jury Demand filed by JONATHAN R. BURRS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zeg)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to use a USPS P.O. Box as his address of record. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/4/22. (lctnm2).
April 4, 2022 SUMMONS (5) Issued as to CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION, SEYFARTH SHAW, LLP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENTS, INC. and U.S. Attorney (zeg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURRS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN R. BURRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEYFARTH SHAW, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER GLOBAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER KIDDE PORTABLE EQUIPMENTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?