GUR-RAVANTAB et al v. BOARD OF REGENTS OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY
Plaintiff: Emir Gur-Ravantab and Emily Lama
Defendant: BOARD OF REGENTS OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY
Case Number: 1:2022cv01038
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BOARD OF REGENTS OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/23/2022. (hmc)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the #1 Complaint by July 23, 2022. The Court also lifts the stay in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/17/22. (lctnm2)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to for Defendant to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BOARD OF REGENTS OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schoenfeld, Alan)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Stayed. (hmc)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part Defendant's #9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. This case is hereby STAYED until the D.C. Circuit issues its mandate in Shaffer v. George Washington University, 27 F.4th 754 (D.C. Cir. 2022). On or before 30 days from the date the Circuit issues its mandate, Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/27/2022. (lctnm3)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BOARD OF REGENTS OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY (Schoenfeld, Alan)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan E. Schoenfeld on behalf of BOARD OF REGENTS OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY (Schoenfeld, Alan)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/19/22. (lctnm3)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to BOARD OF REGENTS OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmh)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by EMILY LAMA, EMIR GUR-RAVANTAB.(Nace, Jonathan)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ERRATA Complaint by EMIR GUR-RAVANTAB, EMILY LAMA re #1 Complaint, filed by EMIR GUR-RAVANTAB, EMILY LAMA. (Nace, Jonathan)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #2 Errata; emailed to jon@nidellaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmh, )
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA Complaint by EMIR GUR-RAVANTAB, EMILY LAMA re #1 Complaint, filed by EMIR GUR-RAVANTAB, EMILY LAMA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Nace, Jonathan) Modified on 4/18/2022 (zsb).
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to jon@nidellaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmh, )
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order RESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional Status re #1 COMPLAINT against BOARD OF REGENTS OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY with Jury Demand filed by Emily Lama, Emir Gur-Ravantab. (Nace, Jonathan).Your attorney renewal has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 4/21/2022. (znm) Modified on 4/14/2022 (znm).
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOARD OF REGENTS OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9169851) filed by Emily Lama, Emir Gur-Ravantab. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Nace, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUR-RAVANTAB et al v. BOARD OF REGENTS OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emir Gur-Ravantab
Represented By: Jonathan B. Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Lama
Represented By: Jonathan B. Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF REGENTS OF GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?