CARMER v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH CARMER
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MARK ADAMCHIK, JOHN DOE OFFICER 1, JOHN DOE OFFICER 2 and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2022cv01100
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/16/2022. (Brooks, Scott)
May 3, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/29/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/28/2022. (Brooks, Scott)
May 3, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARK ADAMCHIK served on 4/29/2022, answer due 5/20/2022 (Brooks, Scott)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 25, 2022. (lcbah1)
April 22, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to MARK ADAMCHIK, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh)
April 22, 2022 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Brooks on behalf of ELIZABETH CARMER (Brooks, Scott)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daren H. Firestone on behalf of ELIZABETH CARMER (Firestone, Daren)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9185560) filed by ELIZABETH CARMER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons US Atty, #3 Summons Summons Atty General, #4 Summons Summons Adamchik)(Firestone, Daren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARMER v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH CARMER
Represented By: Scott Brooks
Represented By: Daren H. Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ADAMCHIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE OFFICER 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE OFFICER 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?