CHARLTON v. LYFT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MEAGHAN CHARLTON
Defendant: LYFT, INC., MICHAEL BUNDU and YONAS NEGASH
Case Number: 1:2022cv01105
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Filing 16 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by YONAS NEGASH.(Trivette, Edward)
June 3, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LYFT, INC. (Bonorchis, Kathryn)
June 3, 2022 Filing 14 RULE 26a2 STATEMENT. (Rafey, Judd)
June 3, 2022 Filing 13 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Trivette, Edward)
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 RULE 26a2 STATEMENT. (Bonorchis, Kathryn)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: the deadline for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings is June 3, 2022; the parties shall submit their initial disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), on or before June 3, 2022; the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of discovery on or before August 25, 2022; Plaintiff shall make initial expert disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(2), on or before September 2, 2022; Defendants shall make their expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), on or before October 7, 2022; discovery shall conclude on November 4, 2022; and a Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for November 14, 2022, at 4:15 p.m. by video conference. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/31/2022. (lcapm3)
May 26, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Initial Scheduling Conference held via videoconference on 5/26/2022. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd)
May 25, 2022 ***Set/Reset Hearings. (zjd)
May 17, 2022 Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LYFT, INC. (Bonorchis, Kathryn)
May 17, 2022 Filing 9 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Regan, Patrick)
May 16, 2022 RESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional Status re #7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Paul Trivette on behalf of YONAS NEGASH (Trivette, Edward).Your attorney renewal has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 5/23/2022. (znm) Modified on 5/17/2022 (znm).
May 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Paul Trivette on behalf of YONAS NEGASH (Trivette, Edward)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MICHAEL BUNDU (Rafey, Judd)
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MICHAEL BUNDU.(Rafey, Judd)
May 9, 2022 Filing 8 Receipt on 5/9/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 001007 B. (zeg)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for May 26, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. by videoconference before Judge Amit P. Mehta. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/22/2022. (lcapm3)
April 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh)
April 22, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmh)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by LYFT, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by LYFT, INC.. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by LYFT, INC..(Bonorchis, Kathryn)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2022 CA 001007 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9186639 filed by LYFT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint - Superior Court, #3 Exhibit Summons - Lyft, #4 Exhibit Initial Order, #5 Exhibit Negash's Answer, #6 Exhibit Bundu's Answer, #7 Exhibit Lyft's Answer, #8 Exhibit Negash's Motion to Substitute Counsel, #9 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Superior Court)(Bonorchis, Kathryn)
April 21, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to kathryn.bonorchis@lewisbrisbois.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHARLTON v. LYFT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEAGHAN CHARLTON
Represented By: Patrick Michael Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYFT, INC.
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Bonorchis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BUNDU
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Bonorchis
Represented By: Judd Alan Rafey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YONAS NEGASH
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Bonorchis
Represented By: Edward Paul Trivette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?