HEBELER v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER HEBELER
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., UBER USA, LLC, PETER RUTAHAKANA, RASIER, LLC and RASIER-DC, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01255
Filed: May 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Foreman on behalf of RASIER, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., UBER USA, LLC (Foreman, Kevin)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Kevin A. Foreman is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for Instructions. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/1/2022. (lcrdm2)
June 29, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kevin A. Foreman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9337772. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RASIER, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., UBER USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Brigitte)
June 28, 2022 Filing 11 REPLY to opposition to motion to remand filed by ALEXANDER HEBELER. (Cullum, Sarah)
June 21, 2022 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by RASIER, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., UBER USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Brigitte)
June 8, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Exhibit 1 by ALEXANDER HEBELER. (Cullum, Sarah)
June 8, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by ALEXANDER HEBELER. (Cullum, Sarah)
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 Receipt on 5/23/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 001245 B. (znmw)
May 20, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by PETER RUTAHAKANA.(Wight, Britton)
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RASIER, LLC, RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., UBER USA, LLC (Smith, Brigitte)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/10/2022. (lcrdm2)
May 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER USA, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RASIER, LLC filed by RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER USA, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RASIER, LLC.(Smith, Brigitte)
May 9, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to brigitte.smith@wilsonelser.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmh, )
May 9, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmh)
May 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2022 ca 1245 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9220099 filed by RASIER-DC, LLC, UBER USA, LLC, UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., RASIER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Civil Information Sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons to Rasier, LLC, #4 Exhibit Summons to Rasier-DC, LLC, #5 Exhibit Summons to Uber Technologies, Inc, #6 Exhibit Summons to Uber USA, LLC, #7 Exhibit Summons to Peter Rutahakana, #8 Exhibit Initial Order and Addendum, #9 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit Docket)(Smith, Brigitte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEBELER v. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER HEBELER
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Cullum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Represented By: Kevin Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBER USA, LLC
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Represented By: Kevin Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER RUTAHAKANA
Represented By: Britton Robert Wight
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASIER, LLC
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Represented By: Kevin Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RASIER-DC, LLC
Represented By: Brigitte Joelle Smith
Represented By: Kevin Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?