KINGS MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL et al v. BECERRA
Plaintiff: KINGS MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL, UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON, UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS HEALTHCARE HOSPITAL, BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN, BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER BEACHES, BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER NASSAU, VALDESE GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC., GRACE HOSPITAL, INC., ANSON HEALTHCARE, MERCY HOSPITAL, INC., CAROLINAS MEDICAL CENTER, UNION MEMORIAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CMS-LINCOLNTON, CMS-UNIVERSITY, BON SECOURS ST. FRANCIS XAVIER and ROPER HOSPITAL, INC.
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Case Number: 1:2022cv01582
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On June 6, 2022, this Court ordered the plaintiffs to show cause, "on or before June 21, 2022... as to why [their] Complaint should not be dismissed for failure to follow the Local Rules." Minute Order of June 14, 2022. Because the plaintiffs have not responded to that order or otherwise corrected the errors in their #1 Complaint, that #1 Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 24, 2022. (lcdlf1)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiff was notified of errors in its #1 Complaint on June 6, 2022. Yet the plaintiff has not corrected the errors and has not sought leave for an extension of time to do so. The Court hereby ORDERS that the plaintiff shall, on or before June 21, 2022, SHOW CAUSE as to why the Complaint should not be dismissed for failure to follow the Local Rules. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 14, 2022. (lcdlf2)
June 6, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #2 Notice of Related Case and #3 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure; emailed to asedley@smhealthlaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
June 6, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to asedley@smhealthlaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Missing address for defendant., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KINGS MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Sedley, Alan) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/6/2022) (znmg). Modified on 6/6/2022 to replace fillable pleading (znmg).
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by KINGS MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL. Case related to Case No. DCCA-22-2648. (Sedley, Alan) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/6/2022) (znmg). (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/6/2022) (znmg). Modified on 6/6/2022 to replace fillable pleading (znmg).
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XAVIER BECERRA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9282906) filed by KINGS MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 01, #3 Summons 02, #4 Summons 03, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C)(Sedley, Alan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/6/2022) (znmg). Modified on 6/6/2022 to replace fillable civil cover sheet (znmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KINGS MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL et al v. BECERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KINGS MOUNTAIN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER TUCSON
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSITY PHYSICIANS HEALTHCARE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER DOWNTOWN
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER BEACHES
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAPTIST MEDICAL CENTER NASSAU
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALDESE GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACE HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANSON HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLINAS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNION MEMORIAL REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMS-LINCOLNTON
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMS-UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BON SECOURS ST. FRANCIS XAVIER
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROPER HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Alan Jay Sedley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?