HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY and VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2022cv02111
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Filing 26 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zed)
September 13, 2022 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Valley Forge Insurance Company filed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Driscoll, Melissa)
September 13, 2022 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT REDLINE AS PER STANDING ORDER against ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY, WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand filed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Komar, Michael)
September 12, 2022 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants and against VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand filed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Komar, Michael)
September 12, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Miranda)
September 7, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie K. Linhart on behalf of CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY (Linhart, Julie)
September 7, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE.(Mumford, John)
September 6, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Driscoll on behalf of HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Driscoll, Melissa)
September 6, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Stephen Komar on behalf of HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Komar, Michael)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Melissa Kelly Driscoll, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(c), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Melissa Kelly Driscoll is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 1, 2022 (lccjn2)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael Stephen Komar, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(c), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Michael Stephen Komar is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 1, 2022 (lccjn2)
August 31, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley A. Norton on behalf of HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Norton, Ashley)
August 29, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Melissa Kelly Driscoll, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9475780. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cleary, Lauri)
August 29, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael Stephen Komar, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9475722. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Certificate, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cleary, Lauri)
August 22, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/12/2022. (zcal)
August 22, 2022 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Miranda)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendant WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY'S #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY shall respond to the #1 Complaint on or before September 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 22, 2022. (lccjn2)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendant OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY shall respond to the #1 Complaint on or before September 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 22, 2022. (lccjn2)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendant CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY'S #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY shall respond to the #1 Complaint on or before September 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 22, 2022. (lccjn2)
August 18, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foggan, Laura)
August 18, 2022 Filing 12 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY (Ventrell, Karen)
August 18, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order of Court)(Ventrell, Karen)
August 17, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responsive Pleadings due by 9/7/2022. (zcal)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Defendant ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE'S #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE shall file responsive pleadings on or before September 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 17, 2022. (lccjn2)
August 16, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mumford, John)
August 9, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY served on 8/3/2022, answer due 8/24/2022 (Cleary, Lauri)
August 4, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022 (Cleary, Lauri)
August 4, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022 (Cleary, Lauri)
August 4, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE served on 8/3/2022, answer due 8/24/2022 (Cleary, Lauri)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 2, 2022. (lccjn2)
July 26, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE, OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsss)
July 25, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. Case related to Case No. 1:21-cv-00236. (Cleary, Lauri)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Cleary, Lauri)
July 19, 2022 RESOLVED.....NOTICE of Provisional Status re #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Cleary, Lauri).Your attorney renewal has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 7/26/2022. (znm) Modified on 7/22/2022 (znm).
July 19, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to lecleary@lerchearly.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Pleading filed as attachment. Please file pleading as separate entry., 2. Notice of Related Case & 26.1 Certificate forms must be filed as separate docket entries., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9379137) filed by HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Line, #3 Summons Ohio Security Insurance, #4 Summons Westfield Insurance Company, #5 Summons Erie Insurance Exchange, #6 Related Case Form- Criminal Related Case Form Civil, #7 Exhibit Rule 26.1 Statement, #8 Summons Continental Casualty Company)(Cleary, Lauri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY v. WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Lauri E. Cleary
Represented By: Melissa Driscoll
Represented By: Michael Stephen Komar
Represented By: Ashley A. Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Miranda D. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Laura Anne Foggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Represented By: John B. Mumford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Julie K. Linhart
Represented By: Karen Ventrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALLEY FORGE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?