EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC v. ANIMO SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC and KUBLR, LLC
Defendant: ANIMO SERVICES, LLC
Counter Defendant: WITH PURPOSE, INC
Case Number: 1:2022cv02198
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT by EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Benson, Sara)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' #29 Status Report, in which Plaintiffs indicate that they "have no objection to the Court dismissing this action without prejudice." Because a counterclaim was filed against Plaintiffs by Defendants, currently in bankruptcy, the Court is concerned that Plaintiff has not yet shown "terms that the [C]ourt considers proper" to dismiss the action without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). Accordingly, the Court's August 18, 2023 minute order directing intermittent filing of status reports stands unless and until Plaintiffs move for relief therefrom. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 8, 2023. (lcckk1)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' #28 Status Report. Plaintiffs represent that the related bankruptcy proceedings remain ongoing, although certain actions in that case may soon be taken that would lead to the voluntary dismissal of this matter. In consideration thereof, Plaintiffs shall file another status report on or before September 8, 2023 and, if necessary, every sixty days thereafter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 10, 2023. (lcckk1)
August 9, 2023 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT by EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, KUBLR, LLC. (Benson, Sara)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A status report in this case was due June 9, 2023. None has been filed. Plaintiff shall file its status report on or before August 10, 2023 updating the Court as to the status of the pending bankruptcy proceedings in the Northern District of Texas. Failure to file this status report may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 8, 2023. (lcckk1)
April 13, 2023 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT by EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Benson, Sara)
February 10, 2023 Filing 26 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record Regarding Defendants/Counter-Claimants Animo Services, LLC and With Purpose, Inc. by EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Evans, Philip)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' #26 Suggestion of Bankruptcy, this matter is STAYED until further order of the Court. Plaintiffs shall file a status report on or before April 14, 2023 and, if necessary, every sixty days thereafter updating the Court as to the pending bankruptcy proceedings in the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 10, 2023. (lcckk1)
November 28, 2022 Filing 25 Joint STATUS REPORT and Joint Discovery Plan by EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, KUBLR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Evans, Philip)
November 22, 2022 Filing 24 RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Evans, Philip)
November 16, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2023. Discovery due by 10/6/2023. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/28/2022. Initial Disclosure due by 11/22/2022. Proponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosure due by 7/31/2023. Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosure due by 8/31/2023; Replies, if any, due by 9/8/2023. Status Conference set for 10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM via Telephonic before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING AND PROCEDURES ORDER. Discovery closes October 6, 2023, and next status conference set for October 12, 2023 at 10:00 AM ET, to proceed via teleconference. See Order for further deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 27, 2022. (lcckk1)
November 15, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Benson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Benson, Sara)
October 27, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/27/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2023. Discovery due by 2/13/2023. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/28/2022. Initial Disclosure due by 11/22/2022. Proponent Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 7/31/2023. Opponent's Rule 26(a)(2)(B)&(C) Disclosures due by 8/31/2023; Replies, if any, due by 9/8/2023. Status Conference set for 10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM via Telephonic/VTC before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards.) (dot)
October 27, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Repko on behalf of All Defendants (Repko, Kathleen)
October 25, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, Amended Declaration of Kathleen McMahon Repko filed by ANIMO SERVICES, LLC, WITH PURPOSE, INC. (Scanlon, Michael)
October 24, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathleen McMahon Repko, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9621912. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANIMO SERVICES, LLC, WITH PURPOSE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathleen McMahon Repko, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Scanlon, Michael)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kathleen McMahon Repko conditional upon counsel Repko filing a declaration by October 31, 2022 stating that they have reviewed and are familiar with the Local Rules of this court. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCrR 44.5(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 24, 2022. (lcckk1)
October 14, 2022 Filing 18 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Evans, Philip)
October 14, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR regarding #17 Meet and Confer Statement. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect court header/case caption/case number. Please refile. (zjm)
October 13, 2022 Filing 17 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Evans, Philip) Modified on 10/14/2022 (zjm).
October 11, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #13 COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, KUBLR, LLC.(Evans, Philip) Modified on 10/11/2022 to correct docket link/text (zjm).
October 11, 2022 Filing 15 ENTERED IN ERROR..... ANSWER to Counterclaim #13 , COUNTERCLAIM against ANIMO SERVICES, LLC, WITH PURPOSE, INC by KUBLR, LLC, EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.(Evans, Philip); Modified on 10/11/2022 (ztth).
October 11, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR regarding #15 Answer to Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect event. Entered in error at the request of counsel. Other - Said pleading will be refiled by counsel. (ztth)
September 22, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2022 at 10:00 AM via Telephonic before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting initial scheduling conference for October 27, 2022 at 10:00 AM ET, to proceed via teleconference. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 22, 2022. (lcckk1)
September 22, 2022 RESOLVED....NOTICE of Provisional Status re #13 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint (Scanlon, Michael).Your attorney renewal has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 9/29/2022. (znm) Modified on 9/23/2022 (zbaj).
September 21, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by WITH PURPOSE, INC, ANIMO SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Scanlon, Michael)
September 8, 2022 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WITH PURPOSE, INC served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022 (Evans, Philip)
September 8, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANIMO SERVICES, LLC served on 9/2/2022, answer due 9/23/2022 (Evans, Philip)
September 1, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to WITH PURPOSE, INC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjm)
August 29, 2022 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against ANIMO SERVICES, LLC, WITH PURPOSE, INC filed by KUBLR, LLC, EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(zjm)
August 29, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Re-Issue of Summons by EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, KUBLR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons)(Evans, Philip) Modified on 9/9/2022 (zjm).
August 29, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, KUBLR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Amended complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Summons)(Evans, Philip)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs explain that service of process was ineffective because they incorrectly identified and served Defendant's registered agent. Accordingly, Plaintiffs seek leave to amend their complaint to correctly identify Defendant's registered agent. Upon good cause shown, Plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket ECF No. 7-2 as Plaintiffs' first amended complaint. Additionally, the Court construes the Motion as satisfying the Court's August 25, 2022 minute order requiring Plaintiffs to explain why they had not yet moved for an entry of default against Defendant. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 29, 2022. (lcckk1)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As Defendant has failed to answer by the required date, August 19, 2022, and otherwise failed to participate in this case, Plaintiff shall, on or before September 8, 2022, move for a default or, alternatively, file a status report explaining why it does not intend to move for a default against Defendant. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 25, 2022. (lcckk1)
August 25, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall move for a default or, alternatively, file a status report explaining why it does not intend to move for a default against Defendant by 9/8/2022. (dot)
August 3, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANIMO SERVICES, LLC served on 7/29/2022, answer due 8/19/2022 (Evans, Philip) Modified on 8/4/2022 to correct date served (zjm).
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/02/2022. (DM)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ANIMO SERVICES, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl)
July 28, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmrl)
July 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Supplemental Exhibits by EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX. 6, #2 Exhibit EX. 7, #3 Exhibit EX. 8, #4 Exhibit EX. 9)(Evans, Philip)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC (Evans, Philip)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANIMO SERVICES, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9396316) filed by EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX. 1, #2 Exhibit EX. 2, #3 Exhibit EX. 3, #4 Exhibit EX. 4, #5 Exhibit EX. 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Evans, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC v. ANIMO SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EASTBANC TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: Philip Tucker Evans
Represented By: Sara Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KUBLR, LLC
Represented By: Philip Tucker Evans
Represented By: Sara Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANIMO SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Michael James Scanlon
Represented By: Kathleen Repko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: WITH PURPOSE, INC
Represented By: Michael James Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?