NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC et al v. BARLOW et al
Plaintiff: NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC and NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC
Defendant: ABIGAIL BARLOW d/b/a ABIGAIL BARLOW PUBLISHING, EMILY BEAR d/b/a JORDAN KING MUSIC USA, PINK & PURPLE LADY, INC., BARLOW & BEAR, LLC, ABIGAIL BARLOW doing business as ABIGAIL BARLOW PUBLISHING and EMILY BEAR doing business as JORDAN KING MUSIC USA
Case Number: 1:2022cv02247
Filed: July 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. § 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2022 Filing 16 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Ehler, Rose)
September 23, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Ehler, Rose)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER construing the #14 Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint as a consent motion for extension of time and granting it. Defendants currently have until August 23, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. See ECF No. 14 at 1. The parties have filed a #14 Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, in which they "STIPULATE, and respectfully request that the Court enter an Order providing, that [Defendants'] deadline [to] answer or otherwise respond to [Plaintiffs'] Complaint" is extended to September 22, 2022. Extensions of time will "be granted only upon motion and not upon stipulation of the parties." See ECF No. 7 ¶ 10. But because the parties request a Court Order granting the requested extension, the Court construes the #14 Joint Stipulation as a consent motion for extension of time. So construed, it is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that the #14 consent motion for extension of time is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by September 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/12/2022. (lctjk2)
August 11, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC, NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ehler, Rose)
August 10, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Grace Fisher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fisher, Virginia)
August 9, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Leda Ehler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ehler, Rose)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Virginia Grace Davis. Virginia Grace Davis is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter to appear for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/05/2022. (lctjk2)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rose Leda Ehler. Rose Leda Ehler is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter to appear for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/05/2022. (lctjk2)
August 4, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BARLOW & BEAR, LLC served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022; EMILY BEAR served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022 (Anders, Ginger)
August 4, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ABIGAIL BARLOW served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022; PINK & PURPLE LADY, INC. served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022 (Anders, Ginger)
August 4, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rose Leda Ehler, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9418321. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC, NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Good Standing)(Anders, Ginger)
August 4, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Virginia Grace Davis, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9418292. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC, NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Anders, Ginger)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/02/2022. (lctjk2)
August 2, 2022 Filing 6 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge James E. Boasberg is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
August 2, 2022 Filing 5 ERRATA by NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC, NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC re Notice of QC- New Case,. (Attachments: #1 Cover)(Anders, Ginger)
August 2, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl)
August 2, 2022 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC, NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC (Anders, Ginger)
August 2, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to ginger.anders@mto.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmrl, )
August 2, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmrl)
July 29, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ginger Dawn Anders on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Anders, Ginger)
July 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9406470) filed by NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Supplement REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT)(Anders, Ginger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC et al v. BARLOW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC
Represented By: Ginger Dawn Anders
Represented By: Rose Leda Ehler
Represented By: Virginia Grace Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC
Represented By: Ginger Dawn Anders
Represented By: Rose Leda Ehler
Represented By: Virginia Grace Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABIGAIL BARLOW d/b/a ABIGAIL BARLOW PUBLISHING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY BEAR d/b/a JORDAN KING MUSIC USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PINK & PURPLE LADY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARLOW & BEAR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABIGAIL BARLOW doing business as ABIGAIL BARLOW PUBLISHING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY BEAR doing business as JORDAN KING MUSIC USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?