MIA et al v. KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED FORHAD MIA, BILLAL, JAKER HOSSEN, SHUVO, MIA MASUM, MOHAMMED KAMRUZZAMAN, SOHEL, MOHAMMED SUMON, NURUL AMIN, MOHAMMED HABIBULLAH MIA, MOHAMMED AKHHRUZZAMAN SARDAR and MOHAMMED IMAMUL HOSSAIN
Defendant: KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION, ANSELL CORPORATION, ANSELL HEALTHCARE PRODUCTS LLC and ANSELL LIMITED
Not Classified By Court: MOHAMMED SHA ALAM SARKER
Case Number: 1:2022cv02353
Filed: August 9, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Carl J Nichols
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/15/2022. Response. due by 2/13/2023 Reply due by 3/15/2023. (zcal)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time and Briefing Schedule, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 15, 2022. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall respond to any motions to dismiss by February 13, 2023. And it is further ordered that any replies in support of any motions to dismiss shall be filed by March 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 4, 2022. (lccjn1)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hall, John)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY to opposition to motion re #5 Motion for Recusal, filed by NURUL AMIN, BILLAL, MOHAMMED IMAMUL HOSSAIN, JAKER HOSSEN, MOHAMMED KAMRUZZAMAN, MIA MASUM, MOHAMMED HABIBULLAH MIA, MOHAMMED FORHAD MIA, MOHAMMED AKHHRUZZAMAN SARDAR, MOHAMMED SHA ALAM SARKER, SHUVO, SOHEL, MOHAMMED SUMON. (Collingsworth, Terrence) Modified docket relationship on 9/9/2022 (zed).
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A. Kramer on behalf of ANSELL HEALTHCARE PRODUCTS LLC (Kramer, Jacob)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #5 Motion for Recusal,,, Defendants' Joint Opposition filed by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Liu, Henry)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Zionts on behalf of KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION (Zionts, David)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Hall on behalf of KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION (Hall, John)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Ben-Heng Liu on behalf of KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION (Liu, Henry)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ANSELL LIMITED. (zed)
August 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Recusal by NURUL AMIN, BILLAL, MOHAMMED IMAMUL HOSSAIN, JAKER HOSSEN, MOHAMMED KAMRUZZAMAN, MIA MASUM, MOHAMMED HABIBULLAH MIA, MOHAMMED FORHAD MIA, MOHAMMED AKHHRUZZAMAN SARDAR, MOHAMMED SHA ALAM SARKER, SHUVO, SOHEL, MOHAMMED SUMON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shuvo Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Terrence Collingsworth and Certificate of Counsel in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A: Transmittal Letter from Judicial Disclosure Committee, #4 Exhibit B-1: Judge Nichols' 2019 Disclosure Form, #5 Exhibit B-2: 2020 Disclosure Form, #6 Exhibit C: 4.20.22 Motion to Vacate, #7 Exhibit D: Judge Nichols' Notice to Parties, #8 Exhibit E: Apple Defendants Opposition to Motion to Vacate, #9 Exhibit F: Reply to Motion to Vacate, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Collingsworth, Terrence)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 19, 2022. (lccjn1)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ERRATA Notice of Filing Errata and Attached Corrected Complaint and Summons by NURUL AMIN, BILLAL, MOHAMMED IMAMUL HOSSAIN, JAKER HOSSEN, MOHAMMED KAMRUZZAMAN, MIA MASUM, MOHAMMED HABIBULLAH MIA, MOHAMMED FORHAD MIA, MOHAMMED AKHHRUZZAMAN SARDAR, MOHAMMED SHA ALAM SARKER, SHUVO, SOHEL, MOHAMMED SUMON re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Errata Corrected Complaint, #2 Summons Corrected Summons for Ansell Limited)(Collingsworth, Terrence)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9431241) filed by MOHAMMED HABIBULLAH MIA, BILLAL, MOHAMMED FORHAD MIA, MOHAMMED IMAMUL HOSSAIN, MOHAMMED KAMRUZZAMAN, JAKER HOSSEN, MOHAMMED SUMON, MOHAMMED AKHHRUZZAMAN SARDAR, SOHEL, SHUVO, NURUL AMIN, MIA MASUM, MOHAMMED SHA ALAM SARKER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Ansell Healthcare Products LLC, #3 Summons ANSELL CORPORATION, #4 Summons KIMBERLY CLARK CORP.)(Collingsworth, Terrence) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/10/2022) (znmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MIA et al v. KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED FORHAD MIA
Represented By: Terrence P. Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLAL
Represented By: Terrence P. Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAKER HOSSEN
Represented By: Terrence P. Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHUVO
Represented By: Terrence P. Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIA MASUM
Represented By: Terrence P. Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED KAMRUZZAMAN
Represented By: Terrence P. Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOHEL
Represented By: Terrence P. Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED SUMON
Represented By: Terrence P. Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NURUL AMIN
Represented By: Terrence P. Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED HABIBULLAH MIA
Represented By: Terrence P. Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED AKHHRUZZAMAN SARDAR
Represented By: Terrence P. Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMED IMAMUL HOSSAIN
Represented By: Terrence P. Collingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: MOHAMMED SHA ALAM SARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION
Represented By: Henry Ben-Heng Liu
Represented By: John Edward Hall
Represented By: David M. Zionts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANSELL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANSELL HEALTHCARE PRODUCTS LLC
Represented By: Jacob A. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANSELL LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?