NICHOLS v. GARLAND et al
Petitioner: Ryan Taylor Nichols
Respondent: MERRICK B. GARLAND and Michelle Jones
Case Number: 1:2022cv02356
Filed: August 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Thomas F Hogan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Prison Condition (Other)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RYAN TAYLOR NICHOLS (Gross, Jonathan)
September 14, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Jones Response To The Petition due by 10/17/2022. (mac)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING #11 Defendant Jones's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Petition. Defendant Jones shall respond to the Petition on or before October 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on September 14, 2022. (lcrg)
September 12, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by MICHELLE JONES. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bluming, Micah)
September 8, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General August 17, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Postal green card)(Gross, Jonathan)
August 29, 2022 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHELLE JONES served on 8/26/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit email showing acceptance of service for Jones via email)(McBride, Joseph) Modified served date on 8/30/2022 (zed).
August 17, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to MERRICK B. GARLAND, MICHELLE JONES. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zed)
August 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Micah Ian Bluming on behalf of MICHELLE JONES (Bluming, Micah)
August 16, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Saindon on behalf of MICHELLE JONES (Saindon, Andrew)
August 15, 2022 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by RYAN TAYLOR NICHOLS. Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by RYAN TAYLOR NICHOLS. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request for Summons, #2 Summons Request for Summons)(McBride, Joseph)
August 15, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; emailed to jmcbride@mcbridelawnyc.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmrl, )
August 11, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint. (McBride, Joseph) Modified docket event/text on 8/17/2022 (zed).
August 11, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McBride, Joseph) Modified docket event/text on 8/17/2022 (zed).
August 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Ryan Taylor Nichols. Case related to Case No. 21-cr-0117. (zmrl)
August 10, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against MERRICK B. GARLAND, Michelle Jones ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ADCDC-9431353) filed by Ryan Taylor Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #5 Related Case Form- Criminal RELATED CASE FORM)(McBride, Joseph)
August 10, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zmrl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NICHOLS v. GARLAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Taylor Nichols
Represented By: Joseph Daniel McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MERRICK B. GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michelle Jones
Represented By: Andrew J. Saindon
Represented By: Micah Ian Bluming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?