COODEY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
Petitioner: LARRY D. DOAK
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Case Number: 1:2022cv02466
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Mandamus & Other (Other)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment as to #5 Order Dismissing Pro Se Case, #4 Memorandum & Opinion by LARRY D. DOAK. (zmrl)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 08/31/2022. (zsb)
August 31, 2022 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 08/31/2022. (zsb)
August 15, 2022 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by LARRY D. DOAK (zmrl)
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LARRY D. DOAK. (zmrl)
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed by LARRY D. DOAK.(zmrl)
August 15, 2022 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/15/2022. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmrl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COODEY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LARRY D. DOAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?