DICLEMENTI v. LYFT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JEANNIE DICLEMENTI
Defendant: MYONG GUN KIM and LYFT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv02634
Filed: August 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2022. Discovery due by 1/20/2023. Summary Judgment motions due by 2/21/2023. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/7/2023. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/13/2023. See Order for further details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/10/2022. (lcac)
October 3, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Proposed Order Scheduling Order by JEANNIE DICLEMENTI re Order,, (Favors, Reshad)
October 3, 2022 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by JEANNIE DICLEMENTI.(Favors, Reshad)
September 30, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Schedule due by 10/4/2022. (tb)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: By October 4, 2022, the parties shall re-file a proposed Scheduling Order that complies with the court's September 8, 2022 Minute Order, and shall email a Word version of the proposed order to Chambers. In addition, Plaintiff shall re-file the Complaint in this matter as a separate docket entry by October 4, 2022. Plaintiff is reminded that failure to comply with the court's orders may result in sanctions up to and including dismissal of the action. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 09/28/2022. (lcss)
September 27, 2022 Filing 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Favors, Reshad)
September 21, 2022 Filing 11 Receipt on 09/21/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022 CA 003500 B. (zjm)
September 19, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Report due by 9/27/2022. (tb)
September 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen M. Herzog on behalf of MYONG GUN KIM (Herzog, Karen)
September 12, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Report due by 9/27/2022. Complaint to be refiled by 9/27/2022. (tb)
September 9, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR regarding Minute Order filed on 09/08/2022. Incorrect format, minute order to be refiled. (tb)
September 9, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR regarding #6 Notice of Appearance. The following error(s) need correction: Please have counsel Karen M. Herzog file the Notice of Appearance in the case. Counsel is reminded that log in and password should match signature page (zjm)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall meet, confer, and file their joint Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3 no later than September 27, 2022. The Report shall include a proposed Scheduling Order in the format found on Judge Chutkan's court webpage, along with any proposed changes which shall be highlighted. On the same day that the parties file their Rule 26 report and proposed Scheduling Order, the parties shall also email a Word version of the proposed order to Chambers. When proposing deadlines, the parties shall avoid proposing a schedule that contains submission of simultaneous dispositive cross-motions. In addition to the requirements under the Federal and Local Rules, the parties' report shall contain a succinct summary of the case and the statutory basis for all causes of action and defenses. Separate Reports will be stricken, sua sponte. In addition, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to re-file the Complaint in this matter as a separate docket entry on or before September 27, 2022. SO ORDERED by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 09/08/22. (tb) Modified on 9/12/2022- dates corrected (tb).
September 8, 2022 Filing 6 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Fonshell Ward on behalf of MYONG GUN KIM (Ward, Margaret) Modified on 9/9/2022 (zjm).
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order ENTERED IN ERROR.....MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall meet, confer, and file their joint Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 16.3 no later than August 27, 2022. The Report shall include a proposed Scheduling Order in the format found on Judge Chutkan's court webpage, along with any proposed changes which shall be highlighted. On the same day that the parties file their Rule 26 report and proposed Scheduling Order, the parties shall also email a Word version of the proposed order to Chambers. When proposing deadlines, the parties shall avoid proposing a schedule that contains submission of simultaneous dispositive cross-motions. In addition to the requirements under the Federal and Local Rules, the parties' report shall contain a succinct summary of the case and the statutory basis for all causes of action and defenses. Separate Reports will be stricken, sua sponte. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/8/2022. (lcac) Modified on 9/9/2022 (ztb).
September 6, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by LYFT, INC..(Bonorchis, Kathryn)
September 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zcb,)
September 1, 2022 Filing 3 ERRATA by MYONG GUN KIM re Notice of QC- New Case,,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Margaret) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/7/2022) (znmw).
September 1, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to mward@downs-ward.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zcb, )
September 1, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zcb,)
August 31, 2022 Filing 2 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE Corrected by MYONG GUN KIM re #1 Notice of Removal, (Ward, Margaret) Modified on 9/1/2022 (zcb, ).
August 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2022 CA 003500 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9483364 filed by MYONG GUN KIM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Superior Court Documents Complaint, #3 Superior Court Documents Answer)(Ward, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DICLEMENTI v. LYFT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANNIE DICLEMENTI
Represented By: Reshad Favors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYONG GUN KIM
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Represented By: Karen M. Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYFT, INC.
Represented By: Kathryn Elizabeth Bonorchis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?