STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2022cv03103
Filed: October 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Please see attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/26/2022. (lcapm2)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Williamson Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Paige Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Stalzer Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
October 13, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (znmg)
October 12, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed)(James, Jacqueline)
October 12, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (James, Jacqueline)
October 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9594551) filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?