STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2022cv03105
Filed: October 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, Dkt. #5 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff may serve the ISP (RCN) with a Rule 45 subpoena commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address as set forth on Exhibit A to the Complaint. Plaintiff shall attach to any such subpoena a copy of this Order. Plaintiff may also serve a Rule 45 subpoena in the same manner as above on any service provider that is identified in response to a subpoena as a provider of Internet services to the Defendant. If the ISP qualifies as a "cable operator," as defined by 47 U.S.C. 522(5), it shall comply with 47 U.S.C. 551(c)(2)(B) by sending a copy of this Order to the Defendant. Plaintiff may only use the information disclosed in response to a Rule 45 subpoena served on the ISP for the purpose of protecting and enforcing Plaintiff's rights as set forth in its Complaint. Plaintiff may not disclose the information it receives without prior authorization from the Court. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/26/2022. (lcrdm2)
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Williamson Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Paige Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Stalzer Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/13/2022. (lcrdm2)
October 13, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb, )
October 12, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed)(James, Jacqueline)
October 12, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (James, Jacqueline)
October 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9594564) filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?