MADANI v. SIGNORELLI et al
Plaintiff: SIAMAK MADANI
Defendant: THOMAS SIGNORELLI and WS CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv03197
Filed: October 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Royce C Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. THOMAS SIGNORELLI served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/24/2022 (Schwaber, Jeffrey)
November 2, 2022 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WS CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC served on 11/1/2022, answer due 11/22/2022 (Schwaber, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to THOMAS SIGNORELLI, WS CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl)
October 24, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to jschwaber@steinsperling.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing 26.1 Disclosure(s). Please submit using the event LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure-Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests., 2. Form filed as fillable PDF. Please file form in a non-fillable PDF format. (zsl, )
October 21, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsl)
October 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9610579), CIVIL COVER SHEET by SIAMAK MADANI, REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by SIAMAK MADANI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Supplement Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1)(Schwaber, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MADANI v. SIGNORELLI et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIAMAK MADANI
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Schwaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS SIGNORELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WS CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?