JABBAR v. DEBELO
Plaintiff: BIBIANA JABBAR
Defendant: ROBERO ABERRA DEBELO
Case Number: 1:2022cv03439
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Filing 8 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaDuca, Kenneth)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on January 10, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 29, 2022. (lcrbw3)
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ROBERO ABERRA DEBELO.(Sarner, Craig)
November 29, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2023 at 10:00 AM Via Videoconference before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mac)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 28, 2022. (lcrbw3)
November 28, 2022 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERO ABERRA DEBELO served on 11/16/2022, answer due 12/7/2022 (LaDuca, Kenneth)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ROBERO ABERRA DEBELO. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn)
November 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by BIBIANA JABBAR filed by BIBIANA JABBAR.(LaDuca, Kenneth)
November 10, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to kladuca@pricebenowitzlaw.com, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (Navas Gonzalez, Luileadny)
November 10, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zljn)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERO ABERRA DEBELO with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9661921) filed by BIBIANA JABBAR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(LaDuca, Kenneth) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/10/2022) (zljn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JABBAR v. DEBELO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIBIANA JABBAR
Represented By: Kenneth J. LaDuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERO ABERRA DEBELO
Represented By: Craig L. Sarner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?