PERLMAN v. PAUL DAVIS RESTORATION, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DIANE PERLMAN
Defendant: PAUL DAVIS RESTORATION, INC., DAVID YOUNG, CFM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, POOL COMPANY and INLOGIX ENTERPRISES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv03476
Filed: November 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff must file a response to the #8 motion to dismiss by January 13, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/20/2022. (lcabj2)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff must file a response to the #6 motion to dismiss by January 13, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/20/2022. (lcabj2)
December 19, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by DIANE PERLMAN. (znmw)
December 19, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss by DIANE PERLMAN. (znmw)
December 12, 2022 Filing 11 REPLY to opposition to motion re #9 Reply to Document filed by CFM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Jessee, Michelle)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. In light of defendant Paul Davis Restoration Inc.'s #8 motion to dismiss, it is ORDERED that plaintiff must file any response by January 6, 2023. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/06/2022. (lcabj2)
December 5, 2022 Filing 9 Memorandum in Opposition to CFM's Motion to Dismiss filed by DIANE PERLMAN. (znmw)
December 3, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by PAUL DAVIS RESTORATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Margaret)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Plaintiff is ORDERED to respond to defendant INLOGIX Enterprises, LLC's motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment on or before January 3, 2023. If plaintiff fails to file a timely response, the Court may grant the motion to dismiss as conceded or accept any facts set forth in defendant's motion for summary judgment as true, and it may decide the matter in defendant's favor without the benefit of plaintiff's position. See Order for detail. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/1/2022. (lcabj2)
December 1, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to defendant INLOGIX Enterprises, LLC's motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment due by 1/3/2023. (ztg)
November 30, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by INLOGIX Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Finamore, Paul). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 11/30/2022 (znmw).
November 30, 2022 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous by INLOGIX Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Finamore, Paul); Modified on 11/30/2022 (ztth).
November 30, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR regarding #5 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous . Said pleading was entered in error at the request of counsel. (ztth)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Paul Davis Restoration, Inc. and David Young must file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 5, 2022. Plaintiff must respond to CFM Management Services, LLC's motion to dismiss, which was filed in the Superior Court of the District of Columbia on October 13, 2022, by December 5, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/22/2022. (lcabj2)
November 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Fonshell Ward on behalf of PAUL DAVIS RESTORATION, INC. (Ward, Margaret)
November 18, 2022 Filing 3 ERRATA Notice of Removal - Corrected by PAUL DAVIS RESTORATION, INC. re Notice of QC- New Case,. (Ward, Margaret)
November 17, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to mward@downs-ward.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. Please list all defendants & the addresses. (Langford, Marquia)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl)
November 14, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmrl)
November 12, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2022 CA 002404 B Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9666628 filed by PAUL DAVIS RESTORATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Superior Court Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Ward, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERLMAN v. PAUL DAVIS RESTORATION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE PERLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL DAVIS RESTORATION, INC.
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID YOUNG
Represented By: Paul M. Finamore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Benitez Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POOL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INLOGIX ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Paul M. Finamore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?