NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE ASSOCIATION et al v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY and DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS and MICHAEL CONNOR
Case Number: 1:2022cv03498
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: John D Bates
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701 Judicial Review of Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL CONNOR served on 11/22/2022; UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS served on 11/22/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/23/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/23/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/22/2023.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proof of Service - US Army Corps of Engineers, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proof of Service - Michael Connor, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Proof of Service - US Attorney General, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Proof of Service - US Attorney's Office)(Huynh, Megan) Modified on 12/7/2022 to correct date AO served (zjm).
November 17, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly F. Moser on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Moser, Kelly)
November 17, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Sabath on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sabath, Mark)
November 17, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjm)
November 16, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. Attorney filed by NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE ASSOCIATION, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION.(Huynh, Megan)
November 16, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for U.S. Attorney General filed by NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE ASSOCIATION, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION.(Huynh, Megan)
November 16, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn)
November 16, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to mhinkle@selcga.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zljn, )
November 16, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zljn)
November 15, 2022 Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE ASSOCIATION (Huynh, Megan)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION (Huynh, Megan)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE (Huynh, Megan)
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Huynh, Megan)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9672055) filed by NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE ASSOCIATION, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Implementation of Navigable Waters Protection Rule Vacatur Talking Points, Key Messages, and Questions and Answers Jan. 4, 2022, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons - Army Corps of Engineers, #4 Summons Michael Connor)(Huynh, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE ASSOCIATION et al v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL WILDLIFE REFUGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Megan Hinkle Huynh
Represented By: Kelly F. Moser
Represented By: Mark Sabath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL PARKS CONSERVATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Megan Hinkle Huynh
Represented By: Kelly F. Moser
Represented By: Mark Sabath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Megan Hinkle Huynh
Represented By: Mark Sabath
Represented By: Kelly F. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Represented By: Megan Hinkle Huynh
Represented By: Mark Sabath
Represented By: Kelly F. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CONNOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?