STRADER v. STATE OF KANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Petitioner: JAMES STRADER
Respondent: STATE OF KANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, RICK FREEMAN, JEFF ZUMDA, JEREMY ROBERT MITCHELLE and DANIEL L SHUMER
Case Number: 1:2022cv03626
Filed: December 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Receipt on 01/04/2023 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 5:23-cv-03002 sent by District of Kansas. (zljn)
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of Kansas pursuant to #3 Order Transferring Pro Se Case, Sent to Court via extraction. (zljn)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 12/29/2022.. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/9/2022. (zmrl)
December 1, 2022 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/01/2022. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zljn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRADER v. STATE OF KANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMES STRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF KANSAS DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RICK FREEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JEFF ZUMDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JEREMY ROBERT MITCHELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DANIEL L SHUMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?