SCHUBERT v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS et al
Plaintiff: ALLAN D. SCHUBERT
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, MICHAEL G. SEIDEL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, J. VILLA and EUGENE E. BAIME
Case Number: 1:2022cv03658
Filed: December 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Prison Condition (Other)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/19/22. (DM)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $34.36 from Prison Account of ALLAN D. SCHUBERT and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/12/2022. (zljn)
December 12, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zljn)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00642. Original file ,transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this civil action is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia, and all documents filed in this civil action shall be received in accordance with the local rules of the District of Columbia. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 12/1/2022 (ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 12/7/2022.]
December 2, 2022 District Transfer Out to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. (ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 12/7/2022.]
December 2, 2022 Remark: Emailed IT Department to electronically transfer case to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Clerk will docket confirmation email when received from the District of Columbia. (ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 12/7/2022.]
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend re #1 Complaint by Allan D. Schubert. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 12/7/2022.]
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Non-Consent to any Magistrate presiding, filed by Allan D. Schubert. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 12/7/2022.]
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 11/8/2022 (ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 12/7/2022.]
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Allan D. Schubert. (Attachments: #1 Supporting docs., #2 Envelope)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 12/7/2022.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for an Order Interlocutory to Compel agents of defendants BOP to provide Plaintiff with six-month print-out of account for IFP purposes, filed by Allan D. Schubert. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 12/7/2022.]
November 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eugene E. Baime, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Michael G. Seidel, and J. Villa filed by Allan D. Schubert. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(ND) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 12/7/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHUBERT v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLAN D. SCHUBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL G. SEIDEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. VILLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EUGENE E. BAIME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?