VORONINA et al v. INNER CIRCLE 1223, LLC et al
Plaintiff: IRINA VORONINA, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO and SARA UNDERWOOD
Defendant: INNER CIRCLE 1223, LLC doing business as DIRTY MARTINI INN BAR and DOES 1 THROUGH 5
Case Number: 1:2022cv03769
Filed: December 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INNER CIRCLE 1223, LLC served on 1/17/2023 (Bondi, Christine)
January 3, 2023 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent and/or trademark. (znmw) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/3/2023) (znmw).
December 23, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to INNER CIRCLE 1223, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn)
December 23, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zljn)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear by CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, SARA UNDERWOOD, IRINA VORONINA. (Golaszewski, John)
December 22, 2022 Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO, SARA UNDERWOOD, IRINA VORONINA re Notice of QC- New Case, #1 Complaint, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Bondi, Christine)
December 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1 THROUGH 5, INNER CIRCLE 1223, LLC d/b/a DIRTY MARTINI INN BAR with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9745722) filed by IRINA VORONINA, SARA UNDERWOOD, CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Bondi, Christine) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/20/2022) (zljn).
December 20, 2022 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to cab@wlekn.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zljn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VORONINA et al v. INNER CIRCLE 1223, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRINA VORONINA
Represented By: Christine Bondi
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDIA SAMPEDRO
Represented By: Christine Bondi
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARA UNDERWOOD
Represented By: Christine Bondi
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INNER CIRCLE 1223, LLC doing business as DIRTY MARTINI INN BAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?