GOZO v. MAYORKAS
Petitioner: MAKUSHA GOZO
Respondent: MAYORKAS
Case Number: 1:2022cv03857
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying as moot #9 motion to compel response to petition. The response is due March 8, 2023. With respect to petitioner's request to amend his petition, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15, the petitioner may amend his complaint as a matter of course if it is filed "(A) 21 days after serving it, or (B) if the pleading is one to which a responsive pleading is required, 21 days after service of a responsive pleading or 21 days after service of a motion under Rule 12(b), (e), or (f), whichever is earlier." Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 15(A)(1). But a complete version of the amended complaint must be provided to the Court; plaintiff cannot simply inform the Court of anticipated changes. See Local Civil Rule 7(i), which requires that a copy of the proposed amended pleading to be attached to a motion. Also, plaintiff states that "he prefer this case be sealed," but to file a document under seal, the document itself must be filed with a motion for leave to file under seal in accordance with Local Civil Rule 5.1(h). For these reasons, petitioner's motion to amend the petition and to seal the case is denied without prejudice; petitioner may refile his motion in accordance with the Federal and Local Rules. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/16/23. (DMK)
February 10, 2023 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File filed by MAKUSHA GOZO. (zjm)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Respondents' Show Cause Order by MAKUSHA GOZO. "Leave to File Granted." Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/08/2023. (zjm)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The response to Petitioner's motion is due by March 8, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/8/23. (DMK)
February 7, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Petition for writ of habeas corpus by MAYORKAS. (Duffey, Thomas)
February 7, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Duffey on behalf of MAYORKAS (Duffey, Thomas)
January 31, 2023 Filing 6 SHOW CAUSE Executed as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General pursuant to Order to Show Cause #2 ; Date of Service of show cause order 01/19/2023. (zjm)
January 30, 2023 Filing 5 SHOW CAUSE Executed as to MAYORKAS pursuant to Order to Show Cause #2 ; Date of Service of show cause order 01/26/2033. (zjm)
January 26, 2023 Filing 4 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- MAKUSHA GOZO - Motion to Oppose Respondent's Expansion of Time This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. " Leave to File Denied. The respondent has not requested any extensions, and this filing does not have any applicability to this case." Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/26/2023. (zjm)
January 23, 2023 Filing 3 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- MAKUSHA GOZO - Motion to Oppose Respondent's Expansion of Time This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. "Leave to File Denied. The respondent has not requested any extensions, and this filing does not have any applicability to this case." Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/23/2023. (zjm)
January 17, 2023 SHOW CAUSE (3) Issued as to MAYORKAS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General pursuant to #2 Order to Show Cause sent to the U.S. Marshals Service (zljn).
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing respondent to state within 20 days from service of petitioner's section 2241 Motion why the writ should not issue; directing service by the court officers (see document for details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/10/23. (psu1)
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 203742.) filed by MAKUSHA GOZO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(znmw) Modified on 1/5/2023 (znmw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOZO v. MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MAKUSHA GOZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MAYORKAS
Represented By: Thomas Duffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?