MONTGOMERY v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Plaintiff: REBECCA MONTGOMERY
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Case Number: 1:2023cv00463
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings and Motion to add parties due by 8/1/2023. All Discovery due by 3/15/2024. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 11/3/2023. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 1/8/2024. Status Report due by 10/13/2023 and 3/22/2024. (smc)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. See attached Scheduling Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/16/2023. (lcrjl1)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Kasey)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY.(Amirthalingam, Nimalan)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Lynn Gaffney on behalf of WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Gaffney, Donna)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/23/2023. (lcrjl1)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY.(Amirthalingam, Nimalan)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nimalan Amirthalingam on behalf of WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Amirthalingam, Nimalan)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY (Amirthalingam, Nimalan) Modified event on 2/23/2023 (znmw).
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2022-CAB-005652 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADCDC-9872552 filed by WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons Complaint)(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/21/2023) (zrtw). (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/21/2023) (zrtw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/28/2023) (zrtw).
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Notice of Removal; emailed to namirthalingam@wmata.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zrtw, )
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zrtw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONTGOMERY v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA MONTGOMERY
Represented By: Kasey Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: Nimalan Amirthalingam
Represented By: Donna Lynn Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?