LONO v. VOX MEDIA, LLC
Plaintiff: NORMAN Y. LONO
Defendant: Vox Media, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00516
Filed: February 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Trevor N McFadden
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE. VOX MEDIA, LLC waiver sent on 3/1/2023, answer due 4/30/2023. (Freeman, James)
February 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James H. Freeman on behalf of NORMAN Y. LONO (Freeman, James)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/27/2023. (lctnm2)
February 27, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to VOX MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zljn)
February 27, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zljn)
February 24, 2023 Filing 2 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Sanders, Craig)
February 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vox Media, LLC with Jury Demand Plaintiff ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9883925) filed by NORMAN Y. LONO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit Infringing Use of the Photograph, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Sanders, Craig) (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/27/2023) (zljn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LONO v. VOX MEDIA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMAN Y. LONO
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Represented By: James H. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vox Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?