HERNANDEZ v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY et al
Plaintiff: JORGE E. HERNANDEZ
Defendant: EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY and DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2023cv00869
Filed: March 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2023 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY served on 5/16/2023, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/17/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/16/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/16/2023. (zjm)
May 17, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION served on 5/16/2023 (zjm)
May 12, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS (4) Issued as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to U.S. Marshals Service (zsl)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the Clerk of Court shall prepare and issue the summonses and coordinate with the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service of process. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/1/2023. (psu1)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 04/20/2023. (lcss)
April 17, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsl)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $18.50 from Prison Account of JORGE E. HERNANDEZ and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 04/13/2023. (zsl)
March 29, 2023 Filing 3 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by JORGE E. HERNANDEZ (zcb)
March 29, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JORGE E. HERNANDEZ. (zcb)
March 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY filed by JORGE E. HERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zcb)
March 29, 2023 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 03/28/2023. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERNANDEZ v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE E. HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?