MOHAMED v. ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: KHALID MOHAMED
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. and ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00974
Filed: April 9, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: James E Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant Rosenberg & Associates' #6 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as conceded per LCvR 7(b), and the case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to that Defendant only. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/7/2023. (lcjeb1)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: A telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference is set for July 10, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.3. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/7/2023. (lcjeb1)
May 12, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Tussey, Sara)
May 12, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Nicholson Tussey on behalf of ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC (Tussey, Sara)
May 8, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A..(Nader, John)
April 14, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC, SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw)
April 14, 2023 Filing 2 ERRATA by KHALID MOHAMED re #1 Complaint,. (Styles, Jeffrey)
April 14, 2023 Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zrtw)
April 10, 2023 NOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to jstyles@washlegal.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zrtw, )
April 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by KHALID MOHAMED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Rosenberg & Associates, #3 Summons Select Portfolio Servicing, #4 Summons Wells Fargo Bank)(Styles, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOHAMED v. ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KHALID MOHAMED
Represented By: Jeffrey Warren Styles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: John Alexander Nader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Represented By: John Alexander Nader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSENBERG & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: Sara Nicholson Tussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?